EP2070877 - Small-scale wastewater treatment plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mall GmbH Hüfinger Strasse 39-45 78166 Donaueschingen-Pfohren / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Budzinski, Volker Erlenstrasse 1 95497 Goldkronach / DE | 02 /
Klemens, Stephan Stebenstrasse 8 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Budzinski, Volker Erlenstrasse 1 95497 Goldkronach / DE | ||
02 /
Klemenz, Stephan Stebenstrasse 8 78073 Bod Dürrheim / DE | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Westphal, Klaus Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020969.5 | 03.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | DE20072016942U | 03.12.2007 Original published format: DE 202007016942 U | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070877 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070877 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
C02F3/1263 (EP);
C02F3/085 (EP);
C02F3/1242 (EP);
C02F3/223 (EP);
C02F1/008 (EP);
C02F1/44 (EP);
C02F2003/003 (EP);
C02F2203/002 (EP);
C02F2209/03 (EP);
C02F2209/42 (EP);
C02F2209/44 (EP);
C02F3/06 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Extension states | BA | 09.09.2009 | RS | 09.09.2009 | Title | German: | Kleinkläranlage | [2009/25] | English: | Small-scale wastewater treatment plant | [2009/25] | French: | Une station d'épuration compacte | [2010/18] |
Former [2009/25] | Une petite station d'épuration | Examination procedure | 09.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 21.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HR | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | MT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | LU | 03.12.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | NO | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 03.12.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 29.09.2010 | |
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
HR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
NO | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20302765U (WISMANN FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03042465 (HENRIKSEN ROBERT [DK]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10203076 (REINHARDT MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [DX]DE10356208 (BOLLER REINHARD [DE], et al) [DX] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0010] - [0034] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE202004001854U (WISSMANN ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [DX]DE202005006689U (MALL GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0010] - [0018] - [0024] - [0031] * * figure 4 *; | [A]EP1860073 (ZAPF WASSERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0009] - [0033] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE10356208 | DE202005006689U |