EP2067433 - Medical appliance, endoscope overtube and endoscope apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corp. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banju, Kazuo c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
Banju, Kazuo c/o Olympus Medical Systems Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020975.2 | 03.12.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | JP20070312875 | 03.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007312875 | JP20080002506 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008002506 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2067433 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067433 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
A61B1/0053 (EP,US);
A61B1/0057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medizinische Vorrichtung, Endoskop und Endoskopvorrichtung | [2009/24] | English: | Medical appliance, endoscope overtube and endoscope apparatus | [2009/24] | French: | Appareil médical, endoscope et appareil endoscopique | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 11.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.12.2013 | [2014/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2007232858 (MACNAMARA FRANCIS T [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,11 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0025] * * figures 2,5 * [A] 8,9; | [X]EP0165718 (PILKINGTON MEDICAL SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,10,11 * figure 11 * * page 11 - page 12 *; | [X]US4762118 (LIA RAYMOND A [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11,12 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 59 * | by applicant | JPH0411687 |