EP2071993 - Partition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALTURA LEIDEN HOLDING B.V. Hagenweg 1 F 4131 LX Vianen ZH / NL | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2009/28] |
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
Baus, Heinz G. Les Figures MC 98000 Monaco / MC | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Meinrad Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schmitt, Meinrad Reble, Klose & Schmitt GbR Patente + Marken Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Schmitt, Meinrad Reble, Klose & Schmitt GbR Patente+Marken Postfach 12 15 19 68066 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021587.4 | 12.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20072017736U | 17.12.2007 Original published format: DE 202007017736 U | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2071993 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2071993 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/36 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
A47K3/36 (EP);
E05D7/04 (EP);
E05F7/08 (EP);
A47K2003/305 (EP);
A47K2003/365 (EP);
E05Y2800/672 (EP);
E05Y2900/114 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Trennwand | [2009/26] | English: | Partition | [2009/26] | French: | Cloison de séparation | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1386690 (ELIASON REFRIGERATOR COMPANY) [X] 1,5-10 * pages 1-4, lines 1-7,9-30,; figures 1,3 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]US1563154 (OLIVER BRAGER, et al) [X] 1-4,8,10 * column 2, lines 68-72,84-89,99-103; figures 1,3-4 * [A] 6,7; | [A]GB2411112 (CORAM SHOWERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,5,8,10 * pages 1-2, lines 14-25; figure 1a *; | [A]CA2391931 (MYRPHARMA B V [NL], et al) [A] 1,6,7,10 * page 3, lines 3-9; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE29718530U (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10 * page 2, lines 19-24; figures 1-3; claims 1-4 * | by applicant | EP1460220 | GB2411112 |