EP2073198 - Optical information recording apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Yuichiro c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Tatsuta, Shinichi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021809.2 | 16.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | JP20070324941 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007324941 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2073198 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0065, G11B7/125, G03H1/00, // G11B7/007 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
G11B7/0065 (EP,US);
G11B7/128 (EP,US);
G03H2210/22 (EP,US);
G03H2223/13 (EP,US);
G03H2225/31 (EP,US);
G11B7/00772 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Informationsaufzeichnungsvorrichtung und -verfahren | [2009/26] | English: | Optical information recording apparatus and method | [2009/26] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'enregistrement d'informations optiques | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/44] | 13.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005057559 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-11* page 5, line 23 - page 6, line 29; figure 3 *; | [A]EP1708182 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019]; figure 2 *; | [X]EP1734516 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0022] - paragraph [0026]; figures 3,5 *; | [A] - TAKEDA Y ET AL, "RANDOM PHASE SHIFTERS FOR FOURIER TRANSFORMED HOLOGRAMS", APPLIED OPTICS, OSA, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC, (19720401), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 818 - 822, XP002447806 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.11.000818 | by applicant | US5483365 | JP2004198816 | JP2005352097 | JP2007172682 | JP2007324941 | - MICHAEL J. O'CALLAGHAN ET AL., "Spatial light modulators with integrated phase masks for holographic data storage", TECH. DIGEST OF ODS 2006, (2006), pages 23 - 25 | - KEVIN CURTIS; ALLEN PU; DEMETRI PSALTIS, "Method for holographic storage using peristrophic multiplexing", OPTICS LETTERS, (1994), vol. 19, no. 13, pages 993 - 994, XP000454704 |