EP2199411 - Epigenetic markers for the identification of CD3 positive T-lymphocytes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epiontis GmbH Rudower Chaussee 29 12489 Berlin / DE | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olek, Sven Boothstrasse 16 12207 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Türbachova, Ivana Boothstrasse 16 12207 Berlin / DE | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/19] | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021838.1 | 16.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199411 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2199411 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Epigenetische Marker zur Identifikation von CD3+ T-Lymphozyten | [2010/25] | English: | Epigenetic markers for the identification of CD3 positive T-lymphocytes | [2010/25] | French: | Marqueurs épigénétiques pour l'identification des lymphocytes T CD3+ | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2014 | 12.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2008 | CY | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/24] | EE | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | EE | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - FLANAGAN B F ET AL, "DNASE HYPERSENSITIVITY AND METHYLATION OF THE HUMAN CD3G AND D GENES DURING T-CELL DEVELOPMENT", IMMUNOGENETICS, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19900101), vol. 31, no. 1, ISSN 0093-7711, pages 13 - 20, XP009113698 [X] 1-19 * the whole document * | [X] - CLEVERS H ET AL, "AN ENHANCER LOCATED IN A CPG-ISLAND 3' TO THE TCR-CD3-EPSILON GENE CONFERS T LYMPHOCYTE-SPECIFICITY TO ITS PROMOTER", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (1989), vol. 8, no. 9, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 2527 - 2536, XP002519563 [X] 1,13 * abstract * * page 2529, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 2531, column 2, paragraph 1 * | [A] - TUTT LANDOLFI M M ET AL, "Specific demethylation of the CD4 gene during CD4 T lymphocyte differentiation.", MOLECULAR IMMUNOLOGY JAN 1997, (199701), vol. 34, no. 1, ISSN 0161-5890, pages 53 - 61, XP002519564 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(96)00104-6 | [A] - LUSSO P ET AL, "Induction of CD4 and susceptibility to HIV-1 infection in human CD8<+> T lymphocytes by human herpesvirus 6", NATURE 1991 GB, (1991), vol. 349, no. 6309, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 533 - 535, XP002519565 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/349533a0 | [A] - GEORGOPOULOS K ET AL, "A T cell-specific enhancer is located in a DNase I-hypersensitive area at the 3' end of the CD3-delta gene.", THE EMBO JOURNAL AUG 1988, (198808), vol. 7, no. 8, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 2401 - 2407, XP002519566 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1213360 | WO2004050706 | EP1826279 | - ANTEQUERA; BIRD, PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 11995 - 9 | - JONES; LAIRD, NATURE GENETICS, (1999), vol. 21, pages 163 - 167 | - ESTELLER, ONCOGENE, (2002), vol. 21, pages 5427 - 5440 | - LAIRD, NATURE, (2003), vol. 3, pages 253 - 266 | - LAIRD, NATURE REVIEWS/CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, pages 253 - 266 | - HAMERMAN JA; PAGE ST; PULLEN AM, "Distinct methylation states of the CD8 beta gene in peripheral T cells and intraepithelial lymphocytes", J IMMUNOL., (19970801), vol. 159, no. 3, pages 1240 - 6 |