EP2199253 - Process and equipment for the production of ammonia make-up syngas with an air separation unit as nitrogen source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ammonia Casale S.A. Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6 6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Panza, Sergio Via Varese 53 22100 Como / IT | [2010/32] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
Panza, Sergio Via sorengo, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 08021962.9 | 18.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199253 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/02, C01B3/38, C01B3/48 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
C01B3/025 (EP,US);
C01B3/38 (EP,US);
C01B3/382 (EP,US);
C01B3/48 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0244 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0283 (EP,US);
C01B2203/068 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/09] |
Former [2010/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Ausrüstung zur Herstellung von Ammoniak-Zusatz-Syngas mit einer Lufttrennungseinheit als Stickstoffquelle | [2010/25] | English: | Process and equipment for the production of ammonia make-up syngas with an air separation unit as nitrogen source | [2010/25] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour la production de gaz de synthèse à composition d'ammoniac avec une unité de séparation d'air en tant que source de nitrogène | [2010/25] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3047257 (DIDIER ENG [DE]) [Y] 1,6,10,14 * claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US2001006615 (BADANO MARCO [CH]) [Y] 1,6,10,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4334257 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0770578 (KELLOGG M W CO [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3630311 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * | [X] - MAX APPL, "Ammonia", ULLMANN'S ENCYCLOPEDIA OF INDUSTRIAL CHEMISTRY, Weinheim, (20061215), pages 1 - 155, XP002529397 [X] 1,2,6-10,14 * page 108, column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.A02.143.PUB2 |