EP2052643 - Toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GILLETTE CANADA COMPANY 4 Robert Speck Parkway Mississauga Ontario L4Z 4C5 / CA | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beals, Donna 840 Talisman Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Roberts, Michael 453 Commercial Street Braintree, MA 02187 / US | 03 /
Wong-Paredes, Maisie 509 Osprey Drive Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | 04 /
Castillo, Bradley 2409 Talavera Drive San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | 05 /
Masterman, Thomas Craig 264 Henry Street San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Töpert, Verena Clarita, et al Braun GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | [2014/29] |
Former [2010/03] | Zetterer, Gerd, et al Braun GmbH Patentabteilung Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Galloway, Peter David, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08022193.0 | 06.11.1998 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | US19970968293 | 12.11.1997 Original published format: US 968293 | US19980177991 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: US 177991 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2052643 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2052643 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A46B9/025 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
A46B5/02 (EP,US);
A46B5/026 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
Y10S15/05 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/18] | Title | German: | Zahnbürste | [2009/18] | English: | Toothbrush | [2009/18] | French: | Brosse à dents | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/40] | 27.08.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.12.2014 | 16.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02012748.6 / EP1240847 | EP98956668.2 / EP0955837 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980956668) is 21.11.2000 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 20.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4589159 (STREIBEL ADOLF [DE]) [A] 3 * column 2, lines 4-18; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US4637660 (WEIHRAUCH GEORG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 8; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US5628082 (MOSKOVICH ROBERT [US]) [A] 5-9* column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 5; figures 18,20,24-26 *; | [X]DE19542393 (ZAHORANSKY ANTON GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 13-34 * * column 3, lines 65-68; figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE29709359U (STANGE DIRK [DE]) [A] 2,4 * figures 1,2 * | Examination | US4081876 | WO9528269 | JPH07327737 | WO9720484 | by applicant | US4589159 | US4637660 | US5628082 | DE19542393 | DE29709359U |