EP2144358 - DC/DC-converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMA Solar Technology AG Sonnenallee 1 34266 Niestetal / DE | [2010/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engel, Bernd Dr. Gärtnerwinkel 2 38302 Wolfenbüttel / DE | 02 /
Mallwitz, Regine Dr. Heinrich-Albert-Str. 3 34131 Kassel / DE | 03 /
Zacharias, Peter Prof. Dr. Heinrich-Albert-Str. 3 34131 Kassel / DE | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Walther Bayer Faber Patentanwälte PartGmbB Heimradstraße 2 34130 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Walther, Walther & Hinz GbR Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Walther, Walther & Hinz GbR Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 08022223.5 | 20.12.2008 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | EP20080012365 | 09.07.2008 Original published format: EP 08012365 | [2010/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2144358 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2144358 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
H02M3/33523 (EP,US);
H02M3/155 (KR);
H02M1/0058 (EP,US);
H02M1/0085 (EP);
H02M7/05 (EP);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Title | German: | DC/DC-Wandler | [2010/02] | English: | DC/DC-converter | [2010/02] | French: | Convertisseur CC/CC | [2010/02] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 18.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2008 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | HR | 08.02.2012 | IE | 08.02.2012 | LT | 08.02.2012 | LV | 08.02.2012 | MT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | PL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | NO | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | IS | 08.06.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
MT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
IE | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
LV | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 08.02.2012 | |
HR | 08.02.2012 | ||
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
PL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 08.02.2012 | |
LT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 08.02.2012 | |
NO | 08.05.2012 | ||
IS | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP1369985 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,10,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0039] , [0040] , [0058]; figure 1 * [A] 3-9,11-14,16-19; | [AD]DE102004037446 (CONERGY AG [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * figure 2 *; | [E]EP2023475 (SMA SOLAR TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [E] 1-19* figure 2 *; | [YA] - KLAASSENS J B, "Power Conditioning with a Switched Series-Resonant Circuit Operating at a High Internal Frequency", TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE, 1987. INTELEC '87. THE NINTH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19870614), ISBN 978-91-7810-916-6, pages 193 - 203, XP031432892 [Y] 1,2,10,15 * page 193, column LEFT; figure 1 * [A] 3-9,11-14,16-19 | [A] - SEVERNS R, "Topologies for three element resonant converters", 19900311; 19900311 - 19900316, (19900311), pages 712 - 722, XP010004735 [A] 1-19 * figure 18 * | by applicant | DE102004037446 |