EP2163782 - Vehicle structural element serving to absorb certain shocks by plastic deformation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal Tubular Products Vitry Z.I. de Vitry Marolles 51300 Vitry le François / FR | [2010/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canot, Cyril 7, rue des Rotisseurs 51300 Virty-Le-François / FR | 02 /
Cocu, Arnaud 13 rue de l'Epaix 59300 Valenciennes / FR | 03 /
Colmont, Jean-Louis 41 rue des Entrechats 95800 Cergy Saint-Christophe / FR | [2010/11] | Representative(s) | de Kernier, Gabriel Cabinet Netter Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/11] | de Kernier, Gabriel Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08022234.2 | 21.05.2004 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | FR20030006888 | 06.06.2003 Original published format: FR 0306888 | [2010/11] | Previously filed application, date | WO2004FR01261 | 21.05.2004 | [2010/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2163782 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2163782 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/12, B62D21/15 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
F16F7/12 (EP,US);
B62D21/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CZ, DE, FR, PL [2010/11] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugbauteil zum Dämpfen von Stössen durch plastische Verformung | [2010/11] | English: | Vehicle structural element serving to absorb certain shocks by plastic deformation | [2010/11] | French: | Elément de structure pour véhicule destiné à amortir certains chocs par déformation plastique | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04742802.4 / EP1631752 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07101354 ; | [A]JPH08188174 ; | [A]US3794348 (FISCHER H) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]JPS49111332 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [XY]US5431445 (WHEATLEY DONALD G [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9-12 * figures 1,2 * * claim 1 * [Y] 6,8,13-14; | [Y]WO9839197 (ALUMAX INC [US], et al) [Y] 6,8 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [X]FR2782305 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 6,9a-9c *; | [Y]FR2824523 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [Y] 13-14 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 1995, no. 7, & JP07101354 A 19950418 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08188174 A 19960723 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |