EP1985486 - A portable automatic car cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hernandez Quijada, Guillermo 2 La Vue Vautier St Oven Jersey JE3 2WF Jersey / GB | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/44] | Application number, filing date | 08033509.4 | 31.01.2008 | [2008/44] | Priority number, date | GB20070008039 | 26.04.2007 Original published format: GB 0708039 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985486 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60J11/00 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
B60J11/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/28] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tragbare und automatische Wagendecke | [2008/44] | English: | A portable automatic car cover | [2008/44] | French: | Dispositif de housse portable et automatique | [2008/44] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4856842 (ROSS RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 5, line 31; figure - *; | [A]GB2242406 (PERNG CHIN YUAN) [A] 1 * page 3, line 19 - page 5, line 17; figure - *; | [A]GB2287441 (TSAI SHANG LU [TW]) [A] 1 * page 9; figure - *; | [A]BE542700 (LAURENT ET SCHU) [A] 1 * page 4; figure - *; | [A]DE9314956U (FRANK WALTER [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |