EP1955955 - Hot-fillable bottle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Rigid Plastics USA, Inc. 935 Technology Drive, Suite 100 Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | [2011/28] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states BALL CORPORATION 10 Longs Peak Drive Broomfield Colorado 80021-2510 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maczek, Elizabeth D. 3715 W 105 Drive Westminster, Colorado 80031 / US | 02 /
Firestone, Kirk P.O. Box 6021 Broomfield, Colorado 80021 / US | [2010/34] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
Maczek, Elizabeth D. 3715 W 105 Drive Westminster Colorado 80031 / US | ||
02 /
Firestone, Kirk P.O. Box 6021 Broomfield Colorado 80021 / US | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08075025.0 | 09.01.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | US20070672754 | 08.02.2007 Original published format: US 672754 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955955 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955955 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02, B65D79/00 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B65D79/0084 (EP,US);
B65D2501/0036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/17] |
Former [2008/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Heiß befüllbare Flasche | [2008/33] | English: | Hot-fillable bottle | [2008/33] | French: | Bouteille à embouteillage à chaud | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 25.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10075158.5 / EP2221253 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0502391 (SIPA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,8-12 * page 1, lines 1-10 * * page 5, lines 15-31; figure 5 * * page 13, lines 30-49 * * claim 22 * [Y] 2-6,14,15; | [Y]JPH08230855 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2005123517 (SIPA PROGETTAZIONE AUTOMAZ [IT], et al) [Y] 4-6 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO0218213 (C02PAC LTD [NZ], et al) [Y] 14,15 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0112511 (PECHINEY EMBALLAGE FLEXIBLE EU [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, lines 14-18 * * page 8, line 21 - page 10, line 12 *; | [A]WO03035485 (ALPLA WERKE [AT], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 14 * * page 4, lines 21-26 *; | [A]US5704504 (BUENO CARLOS EDUARDO DE SIQUEI [BR]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 19-23 * * column 3, lines 33-64 *; | [AD]US5067622 (GARVER LAWRENCE E [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figures 4-6 *; | [AD]US7051890 (ONODA YUKO [JP], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [AD]US6923334 (MELROSE DAVID M [NZ], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figure 1 *; | [AD]US6929139 (DARR RICHARD C [US]) [AD] 1-15 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US5067622 | US6923334 | US6929139 | US7051890 |