EP1935979 - Antigenic meningococcal peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masignani, Vega c/o Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 02 /
Scarlato, Vincenzo c/o Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 03 /
Scarselli, Maria c/o Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 04 /
Galeotti, Cesire c/o Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | 05 /
Mora, Mariarosa c/o Novartis Vaccines Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena / IT | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/26] | Marshall, Cameron John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075128.2 | 13.07.2000 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | GB19990016529 | 14.07.1999 Original published format: GB 9916529 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1935979 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1935979 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/31, C07K14/22, G01N33/53, C12Q1/68, C07K16/12, A61K39/095, A61K39/395, A61K48/00 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/22 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/825 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/26] | Title | German: | Antigene Meningokokken-Peptide | [2008/26] | English: | Antigenic meningococcal peptides | [2008/26] | French: | Peptides de méningococcie antigène | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 14.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | 02.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00944161.9 / EP1196587 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000944161) is 29.07.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9006696 (PRAXIS BIOLOG INC [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]WO9931132 (UNIV QUEENSLAND [AU], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 41 - page 42 * * figures 6,7 * * the whole document *; | [PXL]WO9936544 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [PXL] 4-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9958683 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM BIOLOG [BE], et al) [PX] 4-6,8-13 * the whole document *; | [EL]WO0066741 (CHIRON SPA [IT], et al) [EL] 1-13 * L: priority; page 42 * * the whole document * | Examination | - M. F. ADDIS ET AL, "Cloning and Molecular Characterization of a cDNA Clone Coding for Trichomonas vaginalis Alpha-Actinin and Intracellular Localization of the Protein", INFECTION & IMMUNITY 66(10), (19980101), pages 4924 - 4931, XP055038914 | - CAO Y ET AL, "Cloning and Localization of Two Multigene Receptor Families in Goldfish Olfactory Epithelium", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (19980901), vol. 95, doi:10.1073/PNAS.95.20.11987, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11987 - 11992, XP002207598 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.20.11987 | by applicant | EP0012873 | EP0036259 | EP0036776 | US4336336 | EP0060057 | EP0063953 | US4405712 | EP0121775 | WO8404541 | EP0127328 | EP0127839 | EP0136829 | EP0136907 | EP0155476 | US4546083 | US4551433 | EP0164556 | EP0176170 | US4588684 | US4603112 | EP0196056 | EP0219237 | JPS6296086 | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4689406 | EP0244042 | WO8802406 | US4738921 | US4745056 | EP0267851 | US4762915 | GB2200651 | US4769330 | EP0284044 | US4777127 | US4797368 | WO8901973 | WO8902463 | WO8902468 | WO8904669 | US4837148 | WO8905349 | EP0324647 | EP0324274 | EP0329203 | US4861719 | US4870008 | EP0334301 | WO8909271 | US4876197 | US4880734 | EP0345242 | WO9002806 | US4929555 | WO9007936 | WO9009441 | EP0386882 | WO9011092 | WO9014837 | US4980289 | EP0415731 | WO9102805 | WO9102825 | EP0440219 | WO9114445 | EP0453242 | US5091309 | WO9205266 | WO9207945 | WO9210578 | WO9211033 | US5139941 | US5149655 | US5166057 | US5173414 | EP0524968 | WO9303769 | WO9306223 | WO9307283 | WO9307282 | US5206152 | WO9309239 | WO9310218 | US5217879 | WO9311230 | US5219740 | WO9314778 | WO9319191 | US5252479 | WO9325698 | WO9325234 | WO9403622 | US5288641 | WO9408026 | WO9411506 | WO9412649 | WO9418922 | WO9421792 | US5354678 | WO9424299 | WO9423697 | WO9428152 | WO9428157 | WO9428938 | WO9500655 | WO9502697 | WO9504139 | WO9505835 | WO9507994 | WO9509241 | WO9509654 | WO9511984 | WO9514102 | WO9513796 | US5422120 | WO9524297 | WO9525807 | WO9527071 | WO9529993 | WO9530763 | US5474935 | WO9534671 | US5478745 | WO9605320 | WO9637626 | US5580859 | US5591624 | US5608143 | US5659122 | US5693506 | WO9806437 | WO9820734 | WO9936544 | US6015686 | - POOLMAN JT, INFECT. AGENTS DIS., (1992), vol. 4, pages 13 - 28 | - ALA'ALDEEN; BORRIELLO, VACCINE, (1996), vol. 14, no. 1, pages 49 - 53 | - DNA Cloning, (1985), vol. I-II | - the Methods in Enzymology series, ACADEMIC PRESS, vol. 154-155 | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, (1986), vol. I-IV | - DIJKEMA ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, page 761 | - GORMAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 79, page 6777 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, page 521 | - SASSONE-CORSI; BORELLI, TRENDS GENET., (1986), vol. 2, page 215 | - MANIATIS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 236, page 1237 | - BIRNSTIEL ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, page 349 | - PROUDFOOT, TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (1989), vol. 14, page 105 | - GLUZMAN, CELL, (1981), vol. 23, page 175 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1989), vol. 9, page 946 | - SHIMIZU ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, page 1074 | - LUCKOW; SUMMERS, VIROLOGY, (1989), vol. 17, page 31 | - MILLER ET AL., ANN. REV. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 42, page 177 | - VLAK ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1988), vol. 69, page 765 | - CARBONELL ET AL., GENE, (1988), vol. 73, page 409 | - MAEDA ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, page 592 | - LEBACQ-VERHEYDEN ET AL., MOLEC. CELL. BIOL., (1988), vol. 8, page 3129 | - SMITH ET AL., PROC. NAT'L ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, page 8404 | - MIYAJIMA ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 58, page 273 | - MARTIN ET AL., DNA, (1988), vol. 7, page 99 | - SUMMERS; SMITH, SUPRA | - SMITH ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 2156 | - MILLER ET AL., BIOESSAYS, (1989), vol. 4, page 91 | - Current Protocols in Microbiology, (1990), vol. 2 | - CARBONELL ET AL., J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 56, page 153 | - WRIGHT, NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, page 718 | - FRASER ET AL., VITRO CELL. DEV. BIOL., (1989), vol. 25, page 225 | - ZENK, PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 3861 - 3863 | - VAULCOMBE ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1987), vol. 209, pages 33 - 40 | - CHANDLER ET AL., PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1984), vol. 3, pages 407 - 418 | - ROGERS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 3731 - 3738 | - ROTHSTEIN ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 55, pages 353 - 356 | - WHITTIER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 15, pages 2515 - 2535 | - WIRSEL ET AL., MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 3, pages 3 - 14 | - YU ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 122, pages 247 - 253 | - R.L. JONES; J. MACMILLIN, Gibberellins: in: Advanced Plant Physiology, PITMAN PUBLISHING LIMITED, (1984), pages 21 - 52 | - SHEEN, PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 1027 - 1038 | - MAAS ET AL., EMBO J., (1990), vol. 9, pages 3447 - 3452 | - BENKEL; HICKEY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, pages 1337 - 1339 | - WILMINK; DONS, PLANT MOL. BIOL. REPTR, (1993), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 165 - 185 | - CROSSWAY, MOL. GEN. GENET, (1985), vol. 202, pages 179 - 185 | - KRENS ET AL., NATURE, (1982), vol. 296, pages 72 - 74 | - KLEIN ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73 | - KNUDSEN; MULLER, PLANTA, (1991), vol. 185, pages 330 - 336 | - FRALEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 79, pages 1859 - 1863 | - FROMM ET AL., PROC. NATL ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, page 5824 | - RAIBAUD ET AL., ANNU. REV. GENET., (1984), vol. 18, page 173 | - CHANG ET AL., NATURE, (1977), vol. 198, page 1056 | - GOEDDEL ET AL., NUC. ACIDS RES., (1980), vol. 8, page 4057 | - YELVERTON ET AL., NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1981), vol. 9, page 731 | - "The cloning of interferon and other mistakes", WEISSMANN, Interferon, (1981), page 3 | - SHIMATAKE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, page 128 | - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1983), vol. 25, page 167 | - DE BOER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1983), vol. 80, page 21 | - STUDIER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 189, no. 113 | - TABOR ET AL., PROC NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, page 1074 | - SHINE ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 254, page 34 | - NAGAI ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 309, page 810 | - JIA ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 60, page 197 | - ALLEN ET AL., J. BIOTECHNOL., (1987), vol. 5, page 93 | - MAKOFF ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1989), vol. 135, page 11 | - MILLER ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 7, page 698 | - GHRAYEB ET AL., EMBO J., (1984), vol. 3, page 2437 | - OKA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1985), vol. 82, page 7212 | - PALVA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 79, page 5582 | - AMANN ET AL., GENE, (1985), vol. 40, page 183 | - STUDIER ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 189, page 113 | - POWELL ET AL., APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL., (1988), vol. 54, page 655 | - MASSON ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1989), vol. 60, page 273 | - MILLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, page 856 | - WANG ET AL., J. BACTERIAL., (1990), vol. 172, page 949 | - COHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1973), vol. 69, page 2110 | - DOWER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 6127 | - MANDEL ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 53, page 159 | - TAKETO, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1988), vol. 949, page 318 | - CHASSY ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1987), vol. 44, page 173 | - FIEDLER ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM, (1988), vol. 170, page 38 | - AUGUSTIN ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (1990), vol. 66, page 203 | - BARANY ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1980), vol. 144, page 698 | - PERRY ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1981), vol. 32, page 1295 | - SOMKUTI ET AL., PROC. 4TH EVR. CONG. BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 1, page 412 | - MYANOHARA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1983), vol. 80, page 1 | - COHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1980), vol. 77, page 1078 | - HENIKOFF ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 283, page 835 | - HOLLENBERG ET AL., CURR. TOPICS MICROBIOL. IMMUNOL., (1981), vol. 96, page 119 | - MERCERAU-PUIGALON ET AL., GENE, (1980), vol. 11, page 163 | - PANTHIER ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1980), vol. 2, page 109 | - BOTSTEIN ET AL., GENE, (1979), vol. 8, pages 17 - 24 | - BRAKE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI, (1984), vol. 81, pages 4642 - 4646 | - STINCHCOMB ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 158, page 157 | - ORR-WEAVER ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 101, pages 228 - 245 | - RINE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1983), vol. 80, page 6750 | - BUTT ET AL., MICROBIOL, REV., (1987), vol. 51, page 351 | - KURTZ ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 6, page 142 | - KUNZE ET AL., J. BASIC MICROBIOL., (1985), vol. 25, page 141 | - GLEESON ET AL., J. GEN. MICROBIOL., (1986), vol. 132, page 3459 | - ROGGENKAMP ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENET., (1986), vol. 202, page 302 | - DAS ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1984), vol. 158, page 1165 | - DE LOUVENCOURT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 154, page 737 | - VAN DEN BERG ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, page 135 | - CREGG ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, page 3376 | - HINNEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1978), vol. 75, page 1929 | - ITO ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 153, page 163 | - BEACH; NURSE, NATURE, (1981), vol. 300, page 706 | - DAVIDOW ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1985), vol. 10, page 380471 | - GAILLARDIN ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1985), vol. 10, page 49 | - DE LOUVENCOURT ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (1983), vol. 154, page 1165 | - DAVIDOW ET AL., CURR. GENET., (1985), vol. 10, page 39 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 96 | - ROBINSON; TORRES, SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 9, pages 271 - 283 | - DONNELLY ET AL., ANNU REV IMMUNOL, (1997), vol. 15, pages 617 - 648 | - JOLLY, CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 1, pages 51 - 64 | - KIMURA, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1994), vol. 5, pages 845 - 852 | - CONNELLY, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 6, pages 185 - 193 | - KAPLITT, NATURE GENETICS, (1994), vol. 6, pages 148 - 153 | - O'NEILL, J. VIROL., (1985), vol. 53, page 160 | - KELLY, J. VIROL., (1983), vol. 45, page 291 | - HARTLEY; ROWE, J VIROL, (1976), vol. 19, pages 19 - 25 | - VILE, CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 3860 - 3864 | - VILE, CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 962 - 967 | - RAM, CANCER RES, (1993), vol. 53, pages 83 - 88 | - TAKAMIYA, J NEUROSCI RES, (1992), vol. 33, pages 493 - 503 | - BABA, J NEUROSURG, (1993), vol. 79, pages 729 - 735 | - MANN, CELL, (1983), vol. 33, page 153 | - CANE, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1984), vol. 81, page 6349 | - MILLER, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1990), page 1 | - BERKNER, BIOTECHNIQUES, (1988), vol. 6, page 616 | - ROSENFELD, SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 252, page 431 | - CURIEL, HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 154 | - NAHREINI, GENE, (1993), vol. 124, pages 257 - 262 | - SAMULSKI, J. VIROL., (1987), vol. 61, page 3096 | - SU, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1996), vol. 7, pages 463 - 470 | - GELLER, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 1667 - 1669 | - FINK, HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (1992), vol. 3, pages 11 - 19 | - EVANS, NATURE, (1989), vol. 339, page 385 | - SABIN, J. BIOL. STANDARDIZATION, (1973), vol. 1, page 115 | - FISHER-HOCH, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1989), vol. 86, page 317 | - FLEXNER, ANN NY ACAD SCI, (1989), vol. 569, page 86 | - FLEXNER, VACCINE, (1990), vol. 8, page 17 | - MULLIGAN, NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108 | - MADZAK, J GEN VIROL, (1992), vol. 73, page 1533 | - ENAMI, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1990), vol. 87, pages 3802 - 3805 | - ENAMI; PALESE, J VIROL, (1991), vol. 65, pages 2711 - 2713 | - LUYTJES, CELL, (1989), vol. 59, page 110 | - MCMICHAEL, NEJ MED, (1983), vol. 309, page 13 | - YAP, NATURE, (1978), vol. 273, page 238 | - NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108 | - BUCHSCHACHER, J. VIROL., (1992), vol. 66, page 2731 | - CURIEL, HUM GENE THER, (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 154 | - WU, J BIOL CHEM, (1989), vol. 264, pages 16985 - 16987 | - PHILIP, MOL CELL BIOL, (1994), vol. 14, pages 2411 - 2418 | - WOFFENDIN, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1994), vol. 91, pages 1581 - 1585 | - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432 | - HUCKED, BIOCHEM PHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 40, pages 253 - 263 | - PLANK, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM, (1992), vol. 3, pages 533 - 539 | - WOFFENDIN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1994), vol. 91, no. 24, pages 11581 - 11585 | - STRYER, Biochemistry, W.H. FREEMAN, (1975), pages 236 - 240 | - SZOKA, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1980), vol. 600, page 1 | - BAYER, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1979), vol. 550, page 464 | - RIVNAY, METH ENZYMOL, (1987), vol. 149, page 119 | - WANG, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1987), vol. 84, page 7851 | - PLANT, ANAL BIOCHEM, (1989), vol. 176, page 420 | - HUG; SLEIGHT, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1991), vol. 1097, pages 1 - 17 | - STRAUBINGER, METH. ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - FELGNER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7416 | - MALONE, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1989), vol. 86, pages 6077 - 6081 | - DEBS, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 10189 - 10192 | - SZOKA, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1978), vol. 75, pages 4194 - 4198 | - STRAUBINGER, METH. IMMUNOL., (1983), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1975), vol. 394, page 483 | - WILSON, CELL, (1979), vol. 17, page 77 | - DEAMER; BANGHAM, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1976), vol. 443, page 629 | - OSTRO, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1977), vol. 76, page 836 | - FRALEY, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1979), vol. 76, page 3348 | - ENOCH; STRITTMATTER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1979), vol. 76, page 145 | - FRALEY, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1980), vol. 255, page 10431 | - SZOKA; PAPAHADJOPOULOS, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1978), vol. 75, page 145 | - SCHAEFER-RIDDER, SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 215, page 166 | - BRESLOW, ANNU REV. BIOCHEM, (1985), vol. 54, page 699 | - LAW, ADV. EXP MED. BIOL., (1986), vol. 151, page 162 | - CHEN, J BIOL CHEM, (1986), vol. 261, page 12918 | - KANE, PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1980), vol. 77, page 2465 | - UTERMANN, HUM GENET, (1984), vol. 65, page 232 | - METH. ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 128 | - METH. ENZYMOL. (SUPRA | - PITAS, J. BIOCHEM., (1980), vol. 255, pages 5454 - 5460 | - MAHEY, J CLIN. INVEST, (1979), vol. 64, pages 743 - 750 | - ATKINSON, ANNU REV BIOPHYS CHEM, (1986), vol. 15, page 403 | - RADDING, BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (1958), vol. 30, page 443 | - SAMBROOK ET AL., supra, vol. 2, pages 947 - 957 | - MEINKOTH; WAHL, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 138, pages 267 - 284 | - MATTEUCCI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1981), vol. 103, page 3185 | - URDEA ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1983), vol. 80, page 7461 | - AGRAWAL; LYER, CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1995), vol. 6, pages 12 - 19 | - AGRAWAL, TIBTECH, (1996), vol. 14, pages 376 - 387 | - COREY, TIBTECH, (1997), vol. 15, pages 224 - 229 | - BUCHARDT ET AL., TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, pages 384 - 386 | - MULLIS ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL., (1987), vol. 155, pages 335 - 350 | - GAO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 143, page 3007 | - ROBERTS ET AL., AIDS RES HUM RETROVIR, (1996), vol. 12, page 593 | - QUAKYI ET AL., SCAND J IMMUNOL, (1992), vol. 11, page 9 | - JAMESON; WOLF, "The antigenic index: a novel algorithm for predicting antigenic determinants", CABIOS, (1988), vol. 4, pages 181 - 186, XP001062448 | - HOPP; WOODS, "Prediction of protein antigenic determinants from amino acid sequences", PNAS, (1981), vol. 78, pages 3824 - 3828 | US19940240030 | US19940366787 | US19950405627 | US19960679640 | US19960023867 |