EP2012166 - Microelectromechanical device with optical function separated from mechanical and electrical function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM MEMS Technologies, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states IDC, LLC 3055 Badger Drive Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chui, Clarence 80 Descanso Drive N° 3113 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
Cummings, William 149 Ashton Avenue Millbrae, CA 94030 / US | 03 /
Gally, Brian 346 Bella Vista Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95032 / US | 04 /
Kogut, Lior Alexander Yanai 46A Haifa, Israel 34816 / IL | 05 /
Tung, Ming-Hau 1712 48th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94122 / US | 06 /
Tung, Yeh-Jiun 1134 Pimento Ave. Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 07 /
Chiang, Chih-Wei No. 5 13F-1, Lane No. 73 Chin-Kuo Road Sec. 3 Hsin-Chu City / TW | 08 /
Endisch, Denis 10100 Firwood Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/49] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/02] | Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08075221.5 | 28.03.2008 | [2009/02] | Priority number, date | US20070772777 | 02.07.2007 Original published format: US 772777 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2012166 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2012166 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, B81B3/00, B81C1/00 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
G02B26/001 (EP,KR,US);
B81B3/00 (KR);
B81B3/0051 (EP,KR,US);
B81C1/00 (KR);
G02B26/023 (US);
G02B26/0833 (KR);
B81B2201/047 (EP,KR,US);
G02B26/08 (US);
G02F1/0128 (US);
G02F1/133621 (US);
G02F1/29 (US);
G09G3/3466 (US);
|
Former IPC [2009/02] | G02B26/00, B81B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/02] | Title | German: | Mikroelektromechanische Vorrichtung mit optischer, von der mechanischen und elektrischen Funktion getrennten Funktion | [2009/02] | English: | Microelectromechanical device with optical function separated from mechanical and electrical function | [2009/02] | French: | Dispositif micro-électromécanique avec fonction optique séparée de la fonction mécanique et électrique | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 05.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1640765 (IDC LLC [US]) [X] 1-11,13-23 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037]; figure 8 * [Y] 12; | [X]US2006065940 (KOTHARI MANISH [US]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0097]; figures 10-15 *; | [X]EP1643288 (IDC LLC [US]) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065]; figures 22a, 6 *; | [Y]US2006024880 (CHUI CLARENCE [US], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0143] - paragraph [0152]; figure 22 *; | [A]WO2006036386 (IDC LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0085] * * figures 10,11 *; | [A]US2002149828 (MILES MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026]; figure 7 * | by applicant | US5986796 |