EP2017032 - Aluminum alloy brazing sheet having high-strength and production method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states UACJ Corporation 1-7-2, Otemachi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-1004 / JP | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corporation 14-1, Sotokanda 4-Chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukumoto, Atsushi c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | 02 /
Kano, Hiroshi c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | 03 /
Niikura, Akio c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | 04 /
Bekki, Yoichiro c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | 05 /
Negura, Kenji c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 06 /
Ozaki, Tatsuo c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 07 /
Ninagawa, Toshihide c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 08 /
Okazaki, Kaiichi c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2017/33] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
Fukumoto, Atsushi c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | ||
02 /
Kano, Hiroshi c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | |||
03 /
Niikura, Akio c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | |||
04 /
Bekki, Yoichiro c/o Furukawa-Sky Aluminum Corp. 14-1 Sotokanda 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8970 / JP | |||
05 /
Negura, Kenji c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
06 /
Ozaki, Tatsuo c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
07 /
Ninagawa, Toshihide c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | |||
08 /
Okazaki, Kaiichi c/o DENSO Corporation 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2017/33] |
Former [2009/04] | Baumgärtel, Gunnar, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08075642.2 | 17.07.2008 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | JP20070188856 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007188856 | JP20070188857 | 19.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007188857 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2017032 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2017032 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2017032 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2017032 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/02, C22C21/04, C22C21/00, C22F1/04, B23K35/28, B23K35/02, B32B15/01, F28F21/08, C22F1/043, B23K101/14, B23K103/10 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
B23K35/286 (EP,US);
B23K35/0233 (EP,US);
B32B15/016 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
C22F1/043 (EP,US);
F28F21/089 (EP,US);
B23K2101/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | B23K35/28, B23K35/14, B32B15/01, C22C21/00, C22C21/02, C22F1/04, C22F1/043 | ||
Former IPC [2009/04] | B23K35/28, B23K35/14 | Designated contracting states | CZ, FR, GB [2011/52] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochfestes Hartlotblech aus einer Aluminiumlegierung und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2009/04] | English: | Aluminum alloy brazing sheet having high-strength and production method therefor | [2009/04] | French: | feuille de brasage en alliage d'aluminium à haute résistance et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 21.10.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.05.2018
ADMISSIBLE Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products GmbH Aluminiumstrasse 1 41515 Grevenbroich / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [2018/25] | 20.06.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.10.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.03.2020 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.09.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 28.02.2020 | Appeal received No. T0521/20 | 30.03.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08246117 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1803525 (FURUKAWA SKY ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,8,9* the whole document *; | [E]WO2010000666 (ALERIS ALUMINUM KOBLENZ GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1,4,5,8,9 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH08246117 | - METAL INSTITUTION JOURNAL, (1971), vol. 10, pages 279 - 289 | Opposition | US4161553 | EP0712681 | JPH08246117 | JPH0995749 | US6465113 | JP2004035966 | US2005064226 | JP2005232506 | WO2005095660 | EP1795294 | EP2017032 | EP2130934 | JP2008231555 | - "Legierung: HA 3905-S", Werkstoffdatenblatt Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products, (20040600), XP055498025 | - "Band aus Aluminium, beidseitig plattiert", Werknorm ME95002 A23 c 00, (20050200), vol. suppl.2, page 1, XP055498031 | - Sicking et al., "New Rolled Products for Seam Welded Heat Exchanger Tubes", 3. International Congress Aluminium Brazing, Düsseldorf, (20040000), pages 1 - 8, XP055348928 | - Sapa, "Braze clad FA7850: A heat treatable tube material for controlled atmosphere brazing", Werkstoffdatenblatt zur Legierung FA 7850, (20010200), XP055498044 | - Sapa, "A high-strength, heat-treatable tube material", Datenblatt zur Legierung FA 7850 | - International Alloy Designations and Chemical Composition Limits for Wrought Aluminum and Wrought Aluminum Alloys, (20090200), page 6, 15, XP055136121 | - "Heat Treating", ASM Handbook, volume 4 - Heat Treating, (19910000), vol. 4, page 869, XP055498052 | - "Size measurement of particles", KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, 4th ed, (19970000), vol. 22, pages 256 - 278, XP003028136 | - "Mittelwert", Wikipedia, (20180302), URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Mittelwert&oldid=174529150, XP055498058 | - "Transmission electron microscopy", Wikipedia, (20180412), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Transmission_electron_microscopy&oldid=836143866, XP055498062 | - "HA 4045-D", Material Data Sheet Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products, (20130500), XP055498069 | - "HA 4343-E", Material Data Sheet Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products, (20130500), XP055498074 | - "the rolling mil", Rolling Aluminum: From the Mine through the Mill, (20071200), XP055638070 | - International Alloy Designations and Chemical Composition Limits for Wrought Aluminum and Wrought Aluminum Alloys, (200902), page 6, 15 | - "Heat Treating", ASM Handbook, volume 4 - Heat Treating, (1991), vol. 4, page 869 | - "Size measurement of particles", KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, 4th ed, (1997), vol. 22, pages 256 - 278 | - Yamauchi S. et al, "Development of Corrosion Resistant Brazing Sheet for Drawn Cup Type Evaporators Part I: Alloy Development", SAE International, Technical Paper 930148, (19930301), doi:10.4271/930148, ISSN 0148-7191, | - "Aluminium Alloy Data sheet, 3003", October 2013, Atlas Steels | - "International Alloy Designations and Chemical Composition Limits for Wrought Aluminium and Wrought Aluminium Alloys", 2004, The Aluminium Association | - "Rolling Aluminium: From the Mine Trough the Mill", 2007, The Aluminium Association, pages 4-1 - 4-9 |