EP2174689 - Radiofrequency hyperthermia device with target feedback signal modulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncotherm Kft. Ibolya u. 2 2071 Páty / HU | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szasz, Andras 2. Ibolya u. 2071 Páty / HU | 02 /
Szasz, Oliver 2. Ibolya u. 2071 Páty / HU | 03 /
Szasz, Nora 30 Temple street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2010/15] | Representative(s) | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Arth, Hans-Lothar ABK Patent Attorneys Jasminweg 9 14052 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 08075820.4 | 13.10.2008 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174689 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40, A61K41/00, A61N5/04, A61B18/18 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
A61N1/403 (EP,US);
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00785 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/51] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hochfrequenz-Hyperthermievorrichtung mit Zielrückführungssignalmodulation | [2010/15] | English: | Radiofrequency hyperthermia device with target feedback signal modulation | [2010/15] | French: | Dispositif d'hyperthermie de radiofréquence avec modulation de signal de retour de cible | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004230263 (SAMULSKI THADDEUS V [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * paragraphs [0033] - [0040]; figures 1A,1B,2C,8 * [Y] 4,7; | [A]EP1916013 (ONCOTHERM KFT [HU]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0031] , [0036] , [0048] - [0051]; figure 1 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Kurzanleitung EHY-2000 Serie", ONCOTHERM BROCHURE, (20080430), URL: http://www.oncotherm.hu/images/Downloads/Kurzanleitung_EHY-2000_Serie_german.pdf, (20090227), XP002517602 [Y] 4,7 * page 2 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "EHY-2000 Series", ONCOTHERM BROCHURE, (20080421), URL: http://oncotherm.hu/images/Downloads/EHY_2000_F1.pdf, (20090227), XP002517603 [Y] 4,7 * pages 2-4 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "ONCOTHERMIA CONCEPT & PRACTICE", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20071121), URL: http://www.oncotherm.hu/images/science/OncothermiaConcept.Results2.pdf, (20090227), XP002517604 [Y] 4,7 * page 1, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Oncotherm - Rife and Hyperthermia", INTERNET ARTICLE, (2007), URL: http://www.rife.de/oncotherm_-_rife_and_hyperthermia.html, (20090227), XP002517605 [Y] 4,7 * page 1 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Regionale Elektro-tiefen-Hyperthermie", PRAXISKOOPERATION (BONNER ONKOLOGEN) PATIENTENINFORMATION, (2007), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20071011123237/http://bonner-onkologen.de/html/hyperthermie.html, (20090227), XP002517606 [Y] 4,7 * page 1, paragraph 2 * | by applicant | - KAPITZA PL, "Dynamic stability of a pendulum with an oscillating point of suspension (in Russian), Z. Eksperiment", TEORET. FIZ., (1951), vol. 21, pages 588 - 597 | - THOMSEN JJ; TCHEMIAK DM, "Chelomei's pendulum explained", PROC. ROYAL SOC., (2001), vol. A 457, pages 1889 - 1913 |