EP2085225 - A printing head with a nozzle-cleaning device and a method for decoration by means of the printing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/32] | A printing head with a nozzle-cleaning device and methods for decoration and nozzle-cleaning concerning the printing head | ||
[2011/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingegneria Ceramica S.r.l. Via Vittime 11 Settembre 2001 no. 25/P 41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Ingegneria Ceramica S.r.l. Via Vittime 11 Settembre 2001, no. 25/P 41049 Sassuolo (MO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guidotti, Gian Mario Via Vignolese 108/2 41100 Modena / IT | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Colò, Chiara BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [2009/32] | Application number, filing date | 08075939.2 | 12.12.2008 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | IT2008MO00027 | 30.01.2008 Original published format: IT MO20080027 | [2009/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2085225 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2085225 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2085225 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
B41J2/16552 (EP);
B28B11/001 (EP);
B28B11/044 (EP);
B28B11/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | Druckkopf mit Düsenreinigungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Dekoration mittels des Druckkopfes | [2011/03] | English: | A printing head with a nozzle-cleaning device and a method for decoration by means of the printing head | [2011/03] | French: | Tête d'impression avec dispositif de nettoyage de buse et procédés de décoration au moyen de la tête d'impression | [2011/03] |
Former [2009/32] | Druckkopf mit Düsenreinigungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Dekoration und Düsenreinigung in Bezug auf den Druckkopf | ||
Former [2009/32] | A printing head with a nozzle-cleaning device and methods for decoration and nozzle-cleaning concerning the printing head | ||
Former [2009/32] | Tête d'impression avec dispositif de nettoyage de buse et procédés de décoration et nettoyage de buse concernant la tête d'impression | Examination procedure | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HR | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | MT | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | NO | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | IE | 12.12.2011 | LU | 12.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 12.12.2011 | ||
LU | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 12.12.2011 | ||
LU | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 12.12.2011 | ||
LU | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
MT | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 12.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
HR | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
NO | 06.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3005394 (CANON KK) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-17 * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 9 * * page 13, line 12 - page 14, line 37 * * page 15, line 7 - line 10 * * page 18, line 13 - line 17 * * figures 1,11; claims 1,2,9,10 * [Y] 6,9; | [X]US4367479 (BOWER KENNETH W) [X] 1,2,10-15,17,18 * column 3, line 4 - line 29; figures 1,3,5 *; | [X]US2004082183 (MORI YOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,10-16* paragraphs [0041] , [0044] , [0068] , [0069]; figures 1,3,5 *; | [DY]ITMO20070098 (INGEGNERIA CERAMICA S R L) [DY] 6,9 * the whole document *; | [DPA]EP1972450 (INGEGNERIA CERAMICA S R L [IT]) [DPA] 1-18 * paragraphs [0028] , [0030] , [0032] , [0036]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE3005394 | ITMO20070098 |