EP1942642 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING CALLER IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/28] | Method device and system for displaying caller identification information | ||
[2016/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2008/28] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-743 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jong-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeon, Chul-Yong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2016/44] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
Lee, Jong-Kyu c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Jeon, Chul-Yong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/44] |
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100073.9 | 03.01.2008 | [2008/28] | Priority number, date | KR20070001066 | 04.01.2007 Original published format: KR 20070001066 | [2008/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1942642 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1942642 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1942642 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/57, H04M1/56 | [2008/28] | CPC: |
H04M1/575 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/56 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/10] |
Former [2008/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON DATEN ZUR ANRUFERIDENTIFIKATION | [2016/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISPLAYING CALLER IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION | [2016/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR AFFICHER LES INFORMATIONS D'IDENTIFICATION DE L'APPELANT | [2016/23] |
Former [2008/28] | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und System zur Anzeige von Daten zur Anruferidentifikation | ||
Former [2008/28] | Method device and system for displaying caller identification information | ||
Former [2008/28] | Procédé, dispositif et système pour afficher les informations d'identification de l'appelant | Examination procedure | 03.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 27.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.02.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 21.01.2015 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 27.02.2015 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 13.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41] | Request for further processing for: | 21.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.08.2017 | [2018/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN1829245 (LG ELECTRONICS CHINA RES & DEV [CN]) [X] 1-34 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [I]US2005097131 (BENCO DAVID S [US], et al) [I] 1-34 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025] * |