EP1959424 - Apparatus for controlling an electronic paper device and controlling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/34] | System, method of controlling system and apparatus | ||
[2013/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terazono, Kohei c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Iwata, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Okada, Yoshiyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Terazono, Kohei c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
02 /
Iwata, Satoshi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | |||
03 /
Okada, Yoshiyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/34] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08100079.6 | 03.01.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | JP20070033612 | 14.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007033612 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1959424 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1959424 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959424 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/147, G09G3/36 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
G09G3/3629 (EP,US);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G09G2310/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/14] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Gerät mit Elektronischem Papier und Verfahren zur Steuerung desselben | [2013/52] | English: | Apparatus for controlling an electronic paper device and controlling method thereof | [2013/52] | French: | Appareil de contrôle d'un dispositif de papier électronique et son procédé de commande | [2013/52] |
Former [2008/34] | System, Verfahren zur Steuerung des Systems und Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2008/34] | System, method of controlling system and apparatus | ||
Former [2008/34] | Système, procédé de système de contrôle et appareil | Examination procedure | 25.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 25.02.2010 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 23.04.2010 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 17.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2013 | 08.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002000984 (ASAI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] , [0014] - [0016] - [0047] , [0049] , [0053] , [0115] , [0118] - [0123] - [0174] , [0176] , [0180] , [0185] , [0186] * * paragraphs [0299] , [0315] , [0316] , [0322]; figures 1-6,10-14,42,43 *; | [XY]US2006158335 (JUNG EDWARD K [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9 * paragraphs [0022] , [0029] - [0031] - [0035] , [0038] , [0039] , [0043] , [0044] , [0046] , [0048] , [0049] , [0052] , [0053] , [0057] , [0058] , [0062] , [0063]; figures 1,3-5,9 * [Y] 2-5,7,8,10,11; | [Y]US2003137521 (ZEHNER ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,7,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0153] , [0154]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2005088384 (KAYADA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0101] , [0107] , [0108] , [0112] , [0114] , [0115] , [0119] - [0122] - [0125] , [0141] , [0144] *; | [A]US2004160409 (KOJIMA TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0037] , [0050] , [0061] - [0064] - [0074] - [0076] - [0079]; figures 1,6-8 *; | [A]US2001009417 (ASAI KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0046] , [0047] , [0051] , [0054] , [0088] , [0106] , [0111] - [0113]; figures 1,2,6,7,9,12,13 * | by applicant | JP2005208344 |