EP1981011 - Method and apparatus for providing help [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Ji-bum (202) 954-22 Dogok 1-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08100249.5 | 09.01.2008 | [2008/42] | Priority number, date | KR20070034626 | 09.04.2007 Original published format: KR 20070034626 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981011 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1981011 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G08C17/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/01 (KR);
G06F3/016 (KR);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/16 (KR);
G08C2201/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2013/28] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Hilfe | [2008/42] | English: | Method and apparatus for providing help | [2008/42] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour fournir de l'aide | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 08.05.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.06.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/03] | 05.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6795011 (BERTHOUD CHARLES WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,11,16,17,20,21 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 10 * [Y] 2,8,12,19 [I] 7,18; | [Y]US2005212911 (MARVIT DAVID L [US], et al) [Y] 2,8,12,19* paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0109] *; | [XI]US2007027622 (CLERON MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,11,16-18,20,21 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0068] * [I] 2,12 | by applicant | US6795011 | US2007027622 |