EP1946791 - Indwelling needle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2008/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funamura, Shigeaki c/o Nippon Sherwood 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Wada, Yoshihiro c/o Nippon Sherwood 1217-1 Tomonaga Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100503.5 | 15.01.2008 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | JP20070007638 | 17.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007007638 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946791 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1946791 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M39/06 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
A61M39/0693 (EP,US);
A61M2005/325 (EP,US);
A61M25/0612 (EP,US);
A61M25/0618 (EP,US);
A61M25/0693 (EP,US);
A61M5/3273 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Dauernadel | [2008/30] | English: | Indwelling needle | [2008/30] | French: | Aiguille pour usage de longue durée | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | BE | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HR | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IT | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | LV | 04.08.2010 | MT | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | PT | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | NO | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | IE | 15.01.2011 | LU | 15.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PT | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2011 | ||
LU | 15.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PT | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2011 | ||
LU | 15.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2011 | ||
LU | 15.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
BE | 04.08.2010 | ||
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4842591 (LUTHER RONALD B [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4917668 (HAINDL HANS-GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 9a,9b,9c * * pages 12-15 *; | [A]EP1240916 (MEDIKIT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]WO03002182 (SEWOON MEDICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-5 * figures 3-5 * * pages 6-8 *; | [A]US2005043684 (BASTA MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2427560 (ELCAM MEDICAL AGRICULTURAL COO [IL]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | JPH06509246 |