EP1965156 - Air conditioning device equipped with an electric expansion valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Propriété Industrielle 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière - BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [2010/31] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Propriete Industrielle 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verriere - BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jing Ming 23 rue des Hautes Roches 78700 Conflans Ste Honorine / FR | [2020/15] |
Former [2008/36] | 01 /
LIU, Jing Ming 23 rue des Hautes Roches 78700, Conflans Ste Honorine / FR | Representative(s) | Tran, Chi-Hai, et al Valeo Systèmes Thermiques BG THS - Service Propriété Industrielle THS ZA L' Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/15] | Metz, Gaëlle, et al Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/36] | Léveillé, Christophe Valeo Systemes Thermiques 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière BP 513 78321 Le Mesnil-Saint- Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08100554.8 | 16.01.2008 | [2008/36] | Priority number, date | FR20070001445 | 28.02.2007 Original published format: FR 0701445 | [2008/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965156 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1965156 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/06, // F25B49/02 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F25B49/022 (EP,US);
F25B41/34 (EP,US);
F25B2341/063 (EP,US);
F25B2600/17 (EP,US);
F25B2700/21172 (EP,US);
F25B2700/21173 (EP,US);
Y02B30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/15] |
Former [2008/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klimaanlage mit elektrischem Entspannungsventil | [2008/36] | English: | Air conditioning device equipped with an electric expansion valve | [2008/36] | French: | Installation de climatisation équipée d'une vanne de détente électrique | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2008 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | CZ | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | IT | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | NL | 08.04.2020 | PL | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 16.01.2008 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
PL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.04.2020 | |
CZ | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 08.04.2020 | |
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
NL | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0837291 (DENSO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,15-20,23-26 * column 17, line 51 - column 18, line 6; figures 1,2,6,7,18,19 * [Y] 21,22; | [Y]EP1703229 (THERMAL ANALYSIS PARTNERS LLC [US], et al) [Y] 21,22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0030] - [0047]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP1493979 (VALEO CLIMATISATION [FR]) [A] 21,22 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2539855 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE [FR]) [X] 1-4,8,9,19,20,23,25,26 * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2002081766 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-7,11-14 * abstract *; | [A]WO2006073814 (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2451361 (JAKOB) [A] 5-7 * figure 1; claims 1,2,6-13,15 *; | [A]US2004144106 (DOUGLAS JONATHAN D [US], et al) [A] 5,6,13,14 * paragraphs [0024] , [0027] , [0051] - [0093] *; | [A] - HEYL P, "DER EFFEKTIVE EINSATZ DES INNEREN WAERMEUEBERTRAGERS IN TRANSKRITISCHEN CO2-PROZESSEN THE EFFECTIVE USING OF THE INTERNAL HEAT EXCHANGER IN TRANSCRITICAL CO2-PROZESSES", KI. LUFT- UND KAELTETECHNIK, HEIDELBERG, DE, (200308), vol. 39, ISSN 0945-0459, pages 344 - 348, XP008028728 [A] 19-21 * the whole document * | Examination | US2007000262 | JP2004061061 | FR2815397 | by applicant | EP0837291 | EP1703229 | JP2002081766 |