EP1939293 - Interferon-Like Protein ZCYTO21 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, L.L.C. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, L.L.C. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | ||
For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 1201 Eastlake Avenue East Seattle, WA 98102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sheppard, Paul O. 13532 278th Drive Northwest Granite Falls, WA 98252 / US | 02 /
Presnell, Scott R. 2902 North Puget Sound Avenue Tacoma, WA 98407 / US | 03 /
Fox, Brian A. 3925 Woodlawn Avenue North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | 04 /
Gilbert, Teresa 3431 35th Avenue Southwest Seattle, WA 98126 / US | 05 /
Haldeman, Betty A. 12636 Blakely Place Northwest Seattle, WA 98177 / US | 06 /
Grant, Francis J. 7714 37th Northeast Seattle, WA 98115 / US | [2008/43] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Sheppard, Paul O. 13532 278th Drive Northwest Granite Falls, WA 98252 / US | ||
02 /
Presnell, Scott R. 2902 North Puget Sound Avenue Tacoma, WA 98407 / US | |||
03 /
Fox, Brian A. 3925 Woodlawn Avenue North Seattle, WA 98103 / US | |||
04 /
Gilbert, Teresa 3431 35th Avenue Southwest Seattle, WA 98126 / US | |||
05 /
Haldeman, Betty, A. 12636 Blakely Place Northwest Seattle, WA 98177 / US | |||
06 /
Grant, Francis J. 7714 37th Northeast Seattle, WA 98115 / US | Representative(s) | Griffin, Philippa Jane Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Griffin, Philippa Jane Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08100616.5 | 29.06.2001 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | US20000215446P | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 215446 P | US20010285424P | 20.04.2001 Original published format: US 285424 P | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1939293 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1939293 | Date: | 09.07.2008 | [2008/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/18 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07K14/52 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Interferonähnliches Protein ZCYTO21 | [2008/27] | English: | Interferon-Like Protein ZCYTO21 | [2008/27] | French: | Protéine ZCYTO21 d'interféron | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 27.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01950827.4 / EP1294888 | EP06012489.8 / EP1717316 | Divisional application(s) | EP09172071.4 / EP2132984 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LU MC NL PT SE TR | Date: | 14.08.2009 | [2009/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0032134 (BIOGEN NV [NL]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9640095 (HARRIS RICHARD Y [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0809996 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * figure 5 * * figure 6 * * page 9, line 34 - line 41 *; | [A]WO0037096 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO0037110 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - ADAMS, M.D., ET AL., "3400 expressed sequence tags identify diversity of transcripts from human brain", EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, ebi.hinxton, (19930902), Database accession no. T07139, URL: EBI, HINXTON, XP002202435 [A] * column A * | [A] - DOE JOINT GENOME INSTITUTE STANFORD HUMAN GENOME CENTER, "Homo sapiens chromosome 19 clone CTC-246B18, complete sequence", EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, ebi, hinxton, (19991008), Database accession no. AC011445, URL: EBI, HINXTON, XP002202436 [A] * column A * | [A] - MUZNY, D.M., ET AL., "Homo sapiens chromosome 19 clone RP11-67A5, working draft sequence, 14 unordered pieces", EMBL SEQUENCE LIBRARY, ebi, hinxton, (19991215), Database accession no. AC018477, URL: EBI, HINXTON, XP002202437 [A] * column A * | [A] - BRACK C ET AL, "MOLECULAR ANALYSIS OF THE HUMAN INTERFERON-ALPHA GENE FAMILY", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19811201), vol. 15, no. 4, PART 01, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 379 - 394, XP000605284 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(81)90181-5 | [T] - SHEPPARD PAUL ET AL, "IL-28, IL-29 and their class II cytokine receptor IL-28R", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20030101), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 63 - 68, XP002261756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni873 | [T] - KOTENKO S V ET AL, "IFN-LAMBDAS MEDIATE ANTIVIRAL PROTECTION THROUGH A DISTINCT CLASS II CYTOKINE RECEPTOR COMPLEX", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20030101), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 69 - 77, XP008040607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni875 | [T] - VILCEK JAN, "Novel interferons", NATURE IMMUNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20030101), vol. 4, no. 1, ISSN 1529-2908, pages 8 - 9, XP002398189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni0103-8 | by applicant | WO9640095 | EP0809996 |