EP2090425 - Composite material with a protective layer against corrosion and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydro Aluminium Rolled Products GmbH Aluminiumstrasse 1 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | [2014/05] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH Aluminiumstrasse 1 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Hydro Aluminium Deutschland GmbH Ettore-Bugatti-Strasse 6-14 51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mrotzek, Manfred Lupinenkamp 4 21614, Buxtehude / DE | 02 /
Sicking, Raimund Im Schönen Winkel 29 47506 Neukirchen-Vlyn / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/15] |
Former [2013/40] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100655.3 | 18.01.2008 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090425 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090425 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2090425 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, C22C21/00, F28D1/00, B22D1/00, C23C4/04 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
B22D11/007 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (EP,US);
F28F19/06 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (US);
Y10T428/12764 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/15] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbundwerkstoff mit Korrosionsschutzschicht und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2009/34] | English: | Composite material with a protective layer against corrosion and method for its manufacture | [2009/34] | French: | Matériau composite doté d'une couche de protection contre la corrosion et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 19.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13186323.5 / EP2692524 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.06.2014
18.06.2014
ADMISSIBLE Aleris Rolled Products Germany GmbH Carl-Spaeter-Strasse 10 56070 Koblenz / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Frank Peter Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [2014/30] | 08.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.12.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.06.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.07.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 02.03.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IE | 18.01.2014 | LU | 18.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | CZ | 18.01.2015 | PL | 18.01.2015 | RO | 18.01.2015 | SK | 18.01.2015 | TR | 18.01.2015 | HU | 19.01.2015 | NL | 01.08.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2015 | ||
PL | 18.01.2015 | ||
RO | 18.01.2015 | ||
SK | 18.01.2015 | ||
HU | 19.01.2015 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 02.10.2013 | |
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2015 | ||
PL | 18.01.2015 | ||
RO | 18.01.2015 | ||
SK | 18.01.2015 | ||
HU | 19.01.2015 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2015 | ||
RO | 18.01.2015 | ||
SK | 18.01.2015 | ||
HU | 19.01.2015 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2015 | ||
RO | 18.01.2015 | ||
SK | 18.01.2015 | ||
HU | 19.01.2015 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2015 | ||
RO | 18.01.2015 | ||
SK | 18.01.2015 | ||
HU | 19.01.2015 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2015 | ||
RO | 18.01.2015 | ||
SK | 18.01.2015 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
NL | 01.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1486030 (ALUSUISSE) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 90 * * page 3; example H; table III * * Seite 5, Zeile 22 bis Seite 7, Zeile 39, "Experiment IV.", "Composite 1*, Tabelle VI * * Seite 7, Zeile 40 bis Seite 9, Zeile 9, "Experiment V.", "Composite 1", Tabellen VII und VIII * * claim - *; | [X]JPS57158350 (FURUKAWA ALUMINIUM) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3; example f; table 2 * * page 4; examples 5,11; table 3 *; | [X]JPS5644742 (SUMITOMO LIGHT METAL IND) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3; table 2 * * page 3; examples B1,B3,B6; table 3 * * page 3; examples A2B1,A1B1,A2B3,A4B3,A2B6; table 4 *; | [X]JP2000087162 (MITSUBISHI ALUMINIUM) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 10 - page 11; examples a,m,o; tables 2,3 * * page 16 - page 18; tables 8-10 * * page 18; table 11 * * page 19; examples 1,16,18; table 12 * * page 22; example 56; table 15 *; | [X]JPH02243734 (SKY ALUMINIUM) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3; examples 1,3; table 1 *; | [A]JPH06128674 (SKY ALUMINIUM) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 8; example A5; table 1 *; | [A]EP1075935 (PECHINEY RHENALU [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004028940 (TOYAMA TAKETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Opposition | JPH11172357 | JPH0299325 | JPH10298686 | WO03089237 | US2006003181 | - JP H11172357 TRAN | - Translation für D2b | - D3b_translation.pdf | - HATCH J.E., Aluminum Properties and Physical Metallurgy, OHIO, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR METALS, (1993), pages 100 - 372-373 | - ENGSTRÖM H. ET AL, "A Multilayer Clad Aluminum Material with Improved Brazing Properties", WELDING RESEARCH SUPPLEMENT, (198810), pages 222 - 226 |