EP1955768 - Photocatalyst-carrying structure and photocatalyst coating material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 2-1 Ohtemachi 2-chome,Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8165 / JP | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Nobuo Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co., Ltd, 345 Kanagawa Kanagawa 250-02 / JP | 02 /
Abe, Shinji Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co., Ltd, 345 Kanagawa Kanagawa 250-02 / JP | 03 /
Yoshimoto, Tetsuo Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co., Ltd, 345 Kanagawa Kanagawa 250-02 / JP | 04 /
Fukayama, Shigemichi Odawara Research Center Nippon Soda Co., Ltd, 345 Kanagawa Kanagawa 250-02 / JP | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08100866.6 | 18.06.1996 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | JP19950175422 | 19.06.1995 Original published format: JP 17542295 | JP19950349334 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34933495 | JP19950349335 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34933595 | JP19950349336 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34933695 | JP19950349337 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34933795 | JP19950349338 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34933895 | JP19950353742 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 35374295 | JP19960034350 | 29.01.1996 Original published format: JP 3435096 | JP19960052469 | 15.02.1996 Original published format: JP 5246996 | JP19960063673 | 26.02.1996 Original published format: JP 6367396 | JP19960150115 | 21.05.1996 Original published format: JP 15011596 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955768 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/02, B01J37/02, B01J37/03 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B01J37/036 (EP,US);
B01J35/30 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J37/0219 (EP,US);
B01J37/0225 (EP,US);
C03C17/42 (EP,US);
C03C2217/445 (EP,US);
C03C2217/45 (EP,US);
C03C2217/477 (EP,US);
C03C2217/478 (EP,US);
C03C2217/71 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/33] | Title | German: | Einen Photokatalysator tragende Struktur und Material zur Beschichtung eines Photokatalysators | [2008/33] | English: | Photocatalyst-carrying structure and photocatalyst coating material | [2008/33] | French: | Structure à photocatalyseur et matériau de revêtement de photocatalyseur | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 07.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96917713.8 / EP0923988 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960917713) is 04.11.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 19.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0119331 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-4 * example 9 *; | [X]EP0574274 (NIPPON KOGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 50 * * page 4, line 10 - line 25; example 1 *; | [A]EP0633064 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4* example 1 *; | [E]EP0792687 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4 * example 1 * | Examination | EP0684075 | by applicant | JPS6044053 | JPS60118236 | JPS6266861 | JPH0268190 | JPH05253544 | JPH05309267 | JPH06315614 | EP0633064 | EP0684075 | EP0792687 | - FUMIAKI OOTANIO KOBUNSI KAKO, (1993), vol. 5, no. 42, page 18 | - MANABU KIYONO, "Titanium dioxide", GIHODO, page 165 | - FINE CERAMICS, (1980), vol. 1, pages 216 - 223 | - "Recent development in Photocatalytic Reaction", SYMPOSIUM, (1994), no. 2-11, page 39 |