EP1958593 - Lens delivery system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCON RESEARCH, LTD. 6201 South Freeway 76134-2099 / US | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Downer, David A. 5217 Spanish River Trail Fort Worth, TX 76137 / US | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Hanna, Peter William Derek, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08100876.5 | 24.01.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | US20070675380 | 15.02.2007 Original published format: US 675380 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958593 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958593 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
A61F2/1678 (EP,KR,US);
A61F2/167 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Linseneinführsystem | [2008/34] | English: | Lens delivery system | [2008/34] | French: | Système de mise en place de lentille | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 13.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09154535.0 / EP2062552 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | HR | 08.04.2009 | LT | 08.04.2009 | LV | 08.04.2009 | MT | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | PL | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | NO | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | IS | 08.08.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CY | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
HR | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
MT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
NO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CY | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
HR | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
MT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
NO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CY | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
HR | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
MT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
NO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
HR | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
MT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
NO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
HR | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
NO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NO | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5494484 (FEINGOLD VLADIMIR [US]) [AD] 1-6 * column 6, line 37 - line 54; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US5616148 (EAGLES DANIEL C [US], et al) [AD] 1-6 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 11 * * column 8, line 52 - line 64 * * figures 2,8-11 *; | [A]US2006200167 (PETERSON ROD T [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0080]; figure 21 * | by applicant | US4681102 | US5275604 | US5494484 | US5499987 | US5616148 | US5620450 | US5653715 | US5716364 | US7156854 |