EP1959713 - Method for generating a signal tone in a hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos GmbH Henri-Dunant-Straße 100 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pape, Sebastian Hauptstraße 109 91054 Erlangen / DE | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08100942.5 | 25.01.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | DE20071007120 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007007120 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959713 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959713 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
H04R25/505 (EP,US);
H04R25/305 (EP,US);
H04R25/353 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, LI [2009/18] |
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen eines Signaltons in einem Hörgerät | [2008/34] | English: | Method for generating a signal tone in a hearing aid | [2008/34] | French: | Procédé destiné à produire un son de signalisation dans un appareil auditif | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.2010
13.08.2010
ADMISSIBLE GN ReSound A/S (DK)/Widex A/S (DK)/ Phonak AG (CH)/Oticon AS (DK) Lautrupbjerg 7/Ny Vestergaardsvej 25 Laubisrütistrasse 28/Kongebakken 9 DK-2750 Ballerup/DK-3500 Vaerloese/ CH-8212 Stäfa/DK-2765 Smoerum / DK Opponent's representative Sandgaard, Anders Gammelgaard Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 DK-2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2015/49] |
Former [2010/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.2010
GN ReSound A/S (DK)/Widex A/S (DK)/ Phonak AG (CH)/Oticon AS (DK) Lautrupbjerg 7/Ny Vestergaardsvej 25 Laubisrütistrasse 28/Kongebakken 9 DK-2750 Ballerup/DK-3500 Vaerloese/ CH-8212 Stäfa/DK-2765 Smoerum / DK Opponent's representative Hansen, Anders Sandgaard Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 DK-2900 Hellerup / DK | 19.08.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.09.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.02.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/11] | Appeal following opposition | 29.09.2011 | Appeal received No. T2173/11 | 29.09.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.01.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.10.2009 | LI | 14.10.2009 | [2016/22] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1553803 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10040660 (KOENIG FLORIAN M [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 67 *; | [A]WO2004088888 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 30, line 11 - page 33, line 21 * |