EP1975471 - Control device of an automatic transmission system with a selector lever adjustment detector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilic, Erich Bleich 10 72805 Unterhausen / DE | 02 /
Heim, Michael Charlottenstrasse 25 71088 Holzgerlingen / DE | [2008/40] | Application number, filing date | 08101127.2 | 31.01.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071014354 | 26.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007014354 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1975471 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1975471 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975471 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16H59/10 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
F16H59/105 (EP);
F16H59/08 (EP);
F16H61/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2010/22] |
Former [2008/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuergerät eines automatischen Getriebes mit einer Wählhebelstellungs-Detektoreinrichtung | [2008/40] | English: | Control device of an automatic transmission system with a selector lever adjustment detector device | [2008/40] | French: | Appareil de commande d'un engrenage automatique doté d'un dispositif de détecteur à réglage de levier sélectif | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1489339 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * paragraphs [0134] , [0135] * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE102005020926 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0059] , [0060] , [0063] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]JPH023741 (JATCO CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPH08329782 (JATCO CORP, et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003139228 (AISIN AW CO) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1489339 |