EP1958846 - End car of a railway convoy for passenger transport and corresponding convoy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport SA 3, avenue André Malraux 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Demarquilly, Francis 5 avenue du Val de Loire 17140 LAGORD / FR | 02 /
Reinhard, Christeller 31 avenue du Général de Gaulle 17000 LA ROCHELLE / FR | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08101601.6 | 13.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | FR20070053217 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: FR 0753217 | [2008/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958846 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958846 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B61D13/00 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
B61D13/00 (EP);
B61F5/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Endwagen eines Wagenzugs zum Transport von Reisenden und entsprechender Wagenzug | [2008/34] | English: | End car of a railway convoy for passenger transport and corresponding convoy | [2008/34] | French: | Voiture d'extrémité de rame ferroviaire de transport de voyageurs et rame correspondante | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/39] | 25.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | HR | 18.11.2009 | IE | 18.11.2009 | IT | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | MT | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SE | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | LU | 13.02.2010 | BG | 18.02.2010 | NO | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.04.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
LU | 13.02.2010 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
IT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
MT | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
HR | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SE | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
NO | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5372073 (CATTANI ILDEBRANDO [CH]) [A] 1,8* figure 1 *; | [Y]DE9409044U (BERGISCHE STAHLINDUSTRIE [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10,12 * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2289877 (ABB RAIL VEHICLES LTD [GB]) [A] 9,10,12 * figure 6 *; | [XY]EP0692421 (VEVEY TECHNOLOGIES SA [CH]) [X] 1,8 * figures 1,3 * [Y] 9,10,12; | [A]DE29518297U (DUEWAG AG [DE]) [A] 9,10,12 * figure 1 *; | [AD]DE19711036 (DUEWAG AG [DE]) [AD] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [X] - PUETTNER G, "DIE PROTOTYPEN DES VOEV-LEICHTBAU-NIEDERFLUR-STADTBAHNWAGENS", ZEITSCHRIFT FUR EISENBAHNWESEN UND VERKEHRSTECHNIK. DIE EISENBAHNTECHNIK + GLASERS ANNALEN, GEORG SIEMENS VERLAGSBUCHHANDLUNG. BERLIN, DE, (199101), vol. 115, no. 1 / 2, ISSN 0941-0589, pages 22 - 34,36, XP000201494 [X] 1,8 * figures 5,16 * | by applicant | EP0968111 |