EP1961693 - System for transporting objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr, Uwe Burgberger Strasse 17 87544 Blaichach / DE | For all designated states Weinig, Franz-Josef Leibistrasse 3 89312 Günzburg / DE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weinig, Franz-Josef Leibistrasse 3 89312, Günzburg / DE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann Schloss Osterberg 89296 Osterberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hutzelmann, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann Schloss Osterberg 89296 Osterberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08101811.1 | 20.02.2008 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | DE20071008691 | 20.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007008691 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961693 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1961693 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/06, B60D1/145, B62D63/06 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B66F9/06 (EP);
B62D63/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/18] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System zum Transportieren von Gegenständen | [2008/35] | English: | System for transporting objects | [2008/35] | French: | Système de transport d'objets | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19958086 (FALLER MASCHB [DE]) [Y] 1-7,9-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002154982 (SCHEDLER SCOTT I [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-7,9,10,12-14 * paragraph [0033]; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US5236299 (OSKAM JOHN [CA]) [Y] 11 * abstract * * column 3, line 19 - line 27 *; | [A]FR2850096 (FIGOUREUX FRANCIS RAYMOND CORN [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10256411 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |