EP1977926 - Control unit and control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barkowski, Andre Hubertusstr. 33 38271 Baddeckenstedt / DE | 02 /
Vollmer, Vasco Am Schoeneberg 24 31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE | 03 /
Kersken, Ulrich Schwarze Heide 13 31199 Diekholzen / DE | 04 /
Meister, Dietmar Heinrich-Brauns-Weg 11b 31141 Hildesheim / DE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/41] | Application number, filing date | 08101893.9 | 22.02.2008 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | DE20071015878 | 02.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007015878 | [2008/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977926 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1977926 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977926 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, B60K37/06 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/22 (EP,US);
B60K35/654 (EP);
B60K35/656 (EP);
B60K37/00 (EP);
B60K2360/141 (EP);
B60K2360/143 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP);
B60K2360/1526 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/05] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bedieneinheit und Bedienverfahren | [2008/41] | English: | Control unit and control method | [2008/41] | French: | Unité et procédé de commande | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 27.11.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 22.02.2012 | [2013/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004081777 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [AD]JP2005071286 (SHARP KK); | [XI]DE102005035111 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) | by applicant | JP2005071286 |