EP1961948 - Filter, particularly fuel filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraft, Gunther Flattichstr. 52/5 71642, Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Rösgen, André Im Wiesengrund 8 73630, Remshalden / DE | 03 /
Müller, Peter Junghansstr. 3 76744 Wörth am Rhein / DE | [2012/42] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
Kraft, Gunther Flattichstr. 52/5 71642, Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
02 /
Rösgen, André Im Wiesengrund 8 73630, Remshalden / DE | |||
03 /
Müller, Peter Ziegelstr. 90 66113, Saarbrücken / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 08101895.4 | 22.02.2008 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | DE20072002785U | 22.02.2007 Original published format: DE 202007002785 U | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1961948 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1961948 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1961948 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/22, B01D35/30 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B01D29/111 (EP,US);
B01D29/21 (EP,US);
B01D35/30 (EP,US);
F02M37/32 (EP,US);
B01D2201/4084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | Filter, insbesondere Kraftstofffilter | [2008/35] | English: | Filter, particularly fuel filter | [2008/35] | French: | Filtre, en particulier filtre de carburant | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2008 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | HR | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | NO | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | AT | 22.02.2013 | GB | 22.02.2013 | IE | 22.02.2013 | LU | 22.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | BE | 28.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
GB | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
HR | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | |
NO | 24.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | NO | 24.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0484710 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2,7-9 * abstract *; | [X]EP0537521 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-17,7-9 * column 13, lines 16-46; figure 9 * * column 5, lines 44-54 *; | [X]EP0745763 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10144698 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]EP1338319 (MATHSON IND [US]) [X] 1-5,7-17 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP0537521 | EP0745763 | EP1338319 |