EP1962387 - Low profile high current power connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Corporation 2901 Fulling Mill Road Middletown, Pennsylvania 17057 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Defibaugh, George Richard 324 Kent Drive Harrisburg, PA 17111 / US | 02 /
Reeser, Nancy Lee 835 Ohio Avenue Lemoyne, PA 17043 / US | 03 /
Peters, George I Jr. 5534 Edsel Street Harrisburg, PA 17109 / US | 04 /
Wood, Donald E 196 Blue Jay Way Hummelstown, PA 17036 / US | 05 /
Blanchfield, Michael Allen 80 St. John's Drive Camp Hill, PA 17011 / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London W6 0LE / GB | ||
Former [2008/35] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 19 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08101977.0 | 26.02.2008 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | US20070678954 | 26.02.2007 Original published format: US 678954 | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962387 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1962387 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1962387 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/46 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
H01R13/46 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/07] |
Former [2008/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Niedrigprofil-Hochstromwandler | [2008/35] | English: | Low profile high current power connector | [2008/35] | French: | Connecteur de puissance de courant élevé à profil bas | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/03] | 10.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003219999 (MINICH STEVEN E [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5* paragraphs [0028] , [0064]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2006003620 (DAILY CHRISTOPHER G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * paragraphs [0044] , [0056]; figures 3,6,22 *; | [XP]WO2007145793 (FCI AMERICAS TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-5 * paragraphs [0050] , [0078]; figures 1,3 * | by applicant | US2006003620 | WO2007145793 |