EP1931078 - CDMA communication system which selectively suppresses data transmissions during establishment of a communication channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Hagley Building, Suite 105 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Hagley Building, Suite 105 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luddy, Michael J. 15 Downing Avenue Sea Cliff, NY 11579 / US | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08102289.9 | 20.06.1997 | [2008/24] | Priority number, date | US19960671067 | 27.06.1996 Original published format: US 671067 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1931078 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1931078 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/14, H04N1/333 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
H04B1/7075 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04B1/70753 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/70755 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/70758 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/708 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/1446 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/00912 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/3333 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/542 (KR);
H04W72/543 (EP,KR,US);
H04B2201/70702 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70703 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3335 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/24] | Title | German: | Datenübertragungen während des Kummunikationskanalaufbaus eines selektiv verhindernden CDMA-Kommunikationssystem | [2008/24] | English: | CDMA communication system which selectively suppresses data transmissions during establishment of a communication channel | [2008/24] | French: | Système de télécommunications AMDC supprimant sélectivement l'émission de données pendant la mise en place d'un canal de communication | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 07.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01117741.7 / EP1152564 | EP97931304.6 / EP0908036 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970931304) is 21.08.2001 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0428407 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, line 47 - page 3, line 51 *; | [A]WO9604718 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0702474 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5526399 (KAMEDA MIHO [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | by applicant | US4384307 | US4583124 |