EP1976362 - Method and device for applying a viscous medium to substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Electronics Assembly Systems GmbH & Co. KG Rupert-Mayer-Strasse 44 81379 München / DE | [2009/35] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fricke, Christian Jocherstr. 7 85221, Dachau / DE | 02 /
Gray, Robert 5730 Lake Windsor Parkway Buford, GA 30518 / US | 03 /
Krause, Gerd Zeppelinstraße 16 74357, Bönnigheim / DE | 04 /
Lion, Wolfgang Rosenweg 10 90602, Pyrbaum / DE | 05 /
Müller, Wolfgang Benzstraße 10 89160, Dornstadt / DE | 06 /
Schmidt, Holger Am Einfang 2 82131, Gauting / DE | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstrasse 58 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/16] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG CT IP L&T Corporate Intellectual Property and Functions Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08102911.8 | 26.03.2008 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | DE20071015536 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: DE102007015536 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1976362 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00, H05K13/04 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H05K13/0061 (EP);
H05K13/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Aufbringen eines viskosen Mediums auf Substrate | [2008/40] | English: | Method and device for applying a viscous medium to substrates | [2008/40] | French: | Dispositif et procédé d'application d'un milieu visqueux sur des substrats | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |