EP2106159 - Loudspeaker panel with a microphone and method for using both [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Jürgen Akazienstr. 5b 31515 Wunstorf / DE | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08103060.3 | 28.03.2008 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106159 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/40 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
H04R1/403 (EP,US);
H04R2201/403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lautsprecherplatte mit einem Mikrophon und Verfahren zur Nutzung beider Elemente | [2009/40] | English: | Loudspeaker panel with a microphone and method for using both | [2009/40] | French: | Panneau de haut-parleur avec un microphone et procédé d'utilisation des deux | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2007052374 (YAMAHA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 20 - page 10, line 9 * * page 20, line 1 - page 35, line 24; figures 4,6,8 * [Y] 3; | [XY]DE102005019604 (L & B LAUTSPRECHER UND BESCHAL [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 30; figures 4,5 * [Y] 4-9; | [Y]WO0167808 (SLAB DSP LTD [NZ], et al) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 18 - page 8, line 5; figures 1a-1b *; | [Y]US2005063552 (SHUTTLEWORTH TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [Y] 4-9 * page 3, paragraph 23 - page 9, paragraph 91; figures 1,4 * |