EP1947701 - Nanowires-based transparent conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambrios Technologies Corporation 2450 Bayshore Parkway, Suite 100 Mountain View, CA 94043-1107 / US | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Cambrios Technologies Corporation 2450 Bayshore Parkway, Suite 100 Mountain View, CA 94043-1107 / US | ||
For all designated states Winoto, Adrian 2910 Franklin St San Francisco, CA 94123 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alden, Jonathan 1600 Villa Street, Apt.169 Mountain View, CA 94041-1170 / US | 02 /
Dai, Haixia 2014 Colony Street, Apt 18 MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
Knapp, Michael R 738 Glenmere Way EMERALD HILLS, CA 94062 / US | 04 /
Na, Shuo 2901 Vineyard Park Drive SAN JOSE, CA 95148 / US | 05 /
Pakbaz, Hash Carisbrook Ct HAYWARD, CA 94542 / US | 06 /
Pschenitzka, Florian 380 Alabama St., Apt.22 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94110 / US | 07 /
Quan, Xina 19100 Brook Lane SARATOGA, CA 95070 / US | 08 /
Spaid, Michael, A 780 Shary Ave. MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94041 / US | 09 /
Wolk, Jeffrey 530 Ferdinand Ave. HALF MOON BAY, CA 94019 / US | 10 /
Winoto, Adrian 2910 Franklin Street 94123 San Francisco / US | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/33] | 01 /
Alden, Jonathan 1600 Villa Street, Apt.169 Mountain View, CA 94041-1170 / US | ||
02 /
Dai, Haixia 2014 Colony Street, Apt 18 MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94043 / US | |||
03 /
Knapp, Michael R 738 Glenmere Way EMERALD HILLS, CA 94062 / US | |||
04 /
Na, Shuo 2901 Vineyard Park Drive SAN JOSE, CA 95148 / US | |||
05 /
Pakbaz, Hash Carisbrook Ct HAYWARD, CA 94542 / US | |||
06 /
Pschenitzka, Florian 380 Alabama St., Apt.22 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94110 / US | |||
07 /
Quan, Xina 19100 Brook Lane SARATOGA, CA 95070 / US | |||
08 /
SpaidD, Michael, A 780 Shary Ave. MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94041 / US | |||
09 /
Wolk, Jeffrey 530 Ferdinand Ave. HALF MOON BAY, CA 94019 / US | |||
10 /
Winoto, Adrian 2910 Franklin Street 94123 San Francisco / US | |||
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
Alden, Jonathan 1600 Villa Street, Apt.169 Mountain View, CA 94041-1170 / US | ||
02 /
Dai, Haixia 2014 Colony Street, Apt 18 MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94043 / US | |||
03 /
Knapp, Michael R 738 Glenmere Way EMERALD HILLS, CA 94062 / US | |||
04 /
Na, Shuo 2901 Vineyard Park Drive SAN JOSE, CA 95148 / US | |||
05 /
Pakbaz, Hash Carisbrook Ct HAYWARD, CA 94542 / US | |||
06 /
Pschenitzka, Florian 380 Alabama St., Apt.22 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94110 / US | |||
07 /
Quan, Xina 19100 Brook Lane SARATOGA, CA 95070 / US | |||
08 /
SpaidD, Michael, A 780 Shary Ave. MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94041 / US | |||
09 /
Wolf, Jeffrey 530 Ferdinand Ave. HALF MOON BAY, CA 94019 / US | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08103187.4 | 14.08.2006 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | US20050707675P | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 707675 P | US20060796027P | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 796027 P | US20060798878P | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 798878 P | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1947701 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1947701 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01B1/22, G02F1/1343, G02B5/02, C23F11/02, // H01L21/768 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
C23F11/02 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
G02F1/13439 (EP);
H01B1/22 (EP);
H01L31/022466 (EP);
H01L31/1884 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Transparente Leiter auf Nanodrahtbasis | [2008/30] | English: | Nanowires-based transparent conductors | [2008/30] | French: | Conducteurs transparents basés sur des nanofils | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/38] | 08.04.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 04.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06801576.7 / EP1922759 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060801576) is 02.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0234347 (IBM [US]) [Y] 15-17 * page 5; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0653763 (SOPHIA SYSTEMS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 14* page 1, line 5 - line 15 *; | [A]US5716663 (CAPOTE MIGUEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 9, line 23 - line 38 *; | [A]US6274412 (KYDD PAUL H [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 7 *; | [Y]US6379745 (KYDD PAUL H [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0015]; claims 1,4,5 *; | [Y]WO03106573 (NANOPOWDERS IND LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 5 - page 13 *; | [Y]WO2004097466 (TAKIRON CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * figures 6,7 *; | [PA]EP1619524 (TAKIRON CO [JP]) [PA] 1-17 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0075] *; | [A] - WALTER E C ET AL, "ELECTRODEPOSITION OF PORTABLE, METAL NANOWIRE ARRAYS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (20020707), vol. 4807, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 83 - 92, XP008072399 [A] 1-8,12-14 * pages 83,84,88; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.456526 | Examination | JP2004196923 | by applicant | EP0234347 | US6379745 | WO03106573 | EP1619524 |