EP1962349 - Nanowires-based transparent conductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambrios Technologies Corporation 2450 Bayshore Parkway, Suite 100 Mountain View, CA 94043-1107 / US | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alden, Jonathan 1600 Villa Street, Apt.169 MOUNTAIN VIEW, 94041-1170 / US | 02 /
Dai, Haixia 2014 Colony Street, Apt 18 MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
Knapp, Michael R 738 Glenmere Way EMERALD HILLS, CA 94062 / US | 04 /
Na, Shuo 2901 Vineyard Park Drive SAN JOSE, CA 95148 / US | 05 /
Pakbaz, Hash Carisbrook Ct HAYWARD, CA 94542 / US | 06 /
Pschenitzka, Florian 380 Alabama St., Apt.22 SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94110 / US | 07 /
Quan, Xina 19100 Brook Lane SARATOGA, CA 95070 / US | 08 /
Spaid, Michael, A 780 Shary Ave. MOUNTAIN VIEW, CA 94041 / US | 09 /
Wolf, Jeffrey 530 Ferdinand Ave. HALF MOON BAY, CA 94019 / US | 10 /
Winoto, Adrian 2910 Franklin Street 94123 San Francisco / US | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08103198.1 | 14.08.2006 | [2008/35] | Priority number, date | US20050707675P | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 707675 P | US20060796027P | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 796027 P | US20060798878P | 08.05.2006 Original published format: US 798878 P | [2008/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1962349 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1962349 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | [2010/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01B1/22, G02F1/1343, G02B5/02, // H01L21/768 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
H01B1/22 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C03C17/008 (EP,US);
C09D11/52 (EP,KR,US);
C23F11/02 (EP,KR,US);
C30B29/02 (EP,KR,US);
C30B29/60 (EP,US);
C30B33/00 (EP,US);
C30B7/02 (EP,US);
G02F1/13439 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/041 (KR);
H01L27/14623 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/02164 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/022466 (EP,US);
B22F1/0547 (EP,KR,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2217/445 (EP,US);
C03C2217/479 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45139 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49175 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H05K1/0269 (EP,US);
H05K1/097 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0154 (EP,US);
H05K2201/026 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10128 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1545 (EP,US);
H05K3/048 (EP,US);
Y10S977/762 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F1/0547 (EP,US,KR);
H01L2224/45139, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01004 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/0102 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00011, H01L2924/01039 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Title | German: | Transparente Leiter auf Nanodrahtbasis | [2008/35] | English: | Nanowires-based transparent conductors | [2008/35] | French: | Conducteurs transparents basés sur des nanofils | [2008/35] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 01.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06801576.7 / EP1922759 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060801576) is 02.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2426318 (MENAUL PAUL L) [Y] 5,6,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5951918 (KUWAJIMA HIDEJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, line 64 - column 8, line 45 *; | [Y]EP1039480 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [Y] 4,8* paragraphs [0027] - [0030]; examples 1-12 *; | [XA]WO02089152 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1,4,7,8 * page 4, column 16 - page 5, column 7; claims 1,8,9,12 * [A] 5,6; | [Y]US2004016914 (MATSUDA MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0024] *; | [Y]JP2004196923 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP, et al) [Y] 1-4,7,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4083945 | JPS5761025B | EP0132565 | US4927689 | US5198267 | US5225244 | US5270364 | US5292784 | US5415815 | US5456747 | US5560998 | US5750054 | US5820957 | US5958514 | US2003068900 | US2003148380 | US2004127640 | US6803392 | US6825239 | US2004253463 | US2005064508 | US6905756 | US2005148480 | US2005170336 | US6929896 | US6939576 | US6949678 | US2005221083 | US6975067 | US2006006120 | US7014918 | US7033729 | US2006254502 | - XIA, Y. ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2002), vol. 14, pages 4736 - 4745 | - XIA, Y. ET AL., NANOLETTERS, (2003), vol. 3, no. 7, pages 955 - 960 | - MAO, C.B. ET AL., "Virus-Based Toolkit for the Directed Synthesis of Magnetic and Semiconducting Nanowires", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 303, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1092740, pages 213 - 217, XP009090510 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1092740 | - MAO, C.B. ET AL., "Viral Assembly of Oriented Quantum Dot Nanowires", PNAS, (2003), vol. 100, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0832310100, pages 6946 - 6951, XP002288377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0832310100 | - N. BUHLER; D. BELLUS, "Photopolymers as a powerful tool in modern technology", PURE & APPL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 67, no. 1, pages 25 - 31 | - J. CRIVELLO, ADVANCES IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 62, pages 1 - 48 | - Y. SUN ET AL., "Crystalline silver nanowires by soft solution processing", NANOLETTERS, (2002), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1021/nl010093y, pages 165 - 168, XP008072569 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl010093y | US20050680491 | US20060815627 |