EP2026599 - Easy-to-assemble one-piece surround speaker structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weistech Technology Co., Ltd. 4F-6, No. 258, Lian Cheng Rd. Chung Ho 235 T'ai pei / TW | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Wei co WEISTECH TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD. 4F-6, No. 258, Lian Cheng Rd Chung Ho 235, Taiwan, Taipei / CN | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08103221.1 | 31.03.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | TW20070213407U | 14.08.2007 Original published format: TW 96213407 U | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2026599 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2026599 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/02 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
H04R5/02 (EP,US);
H04R1/025 (EP,US);
H04R2205/022 (EP,US);
H04S3/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/18] |
Former [2009/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einfach zu montierende einteilige Surroundlautsprecherstruktur | [2009/08] | English: | Easy-to-assemble one-piece surround speaker structure | [2009/08] | French: | Structure d'enceinte d'ambiance d'un seul tenant facile à assembler | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/35] | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20308678U (GROSKLAUS PETER [DE]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [I]AU2006100627 (TUCCI AUGUSTO [AU]) [I] 1-9 * pages 2,17; figures 3-4 *; | [A]WO2007007083 (1 LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,8 * |