EP1944814 - Piezoelectric Actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies Holding S.à.r.l. Avenue de Luxembourg 4940 Bascharage / LU | [2010/12] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bosch, Russell 12152 Hoisington Road Gaines, MI 48436 / US | 02 /
Cooke, Michael 52 Burnt Oak Terrace Gillingham, Kent ME7 1DR / GB | 03 /
Goat, Christopher A The Walnut Tree, North Meadow Offham, Kent ME19 5NU / GB | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham Kent ME8 0RU / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Gregory, John David Charles Delphi Diesel Systems Patent Department Courteney Road Gillingham, Kent ME8 0RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08103336.7 | 16.09.2005 | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1944814 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1944814 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/083, // H01L41/047 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
H10N30/871 (EP,US);
H10N30/053 (EP,US);
H10N30/508 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Aktor | [2008/29] | English: | Piezoelectric Actuator | [2008/29] | French: | Actionneur piézoélectrique | [2008/29] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 11.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05255752.7 / EP1764844 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050255752) is 11.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 30.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2005 | BE | 09.11.2011 | CY | 09.11.2011 | CZ | 09.11.2011 | DK | 09.11.2011 | EE | 09.11.2011 | FI | 09.11.2011 | IT | 09.11.2011 | LT | 09.11.2011 | LV | 09.11.2011 | NL | 09.11.2011 | PL | 09.11.2011 | RO | 09.11.2011 | SE | 09.11.2011 | SI | 09.11.2011 | SK | 09.11.2011 | TR | 09.11.2011 | BG | 09.02.2012 | GR | 10.02.2012 | ES | 20.02.2012 | IS | 09.03.2012 | PT | 09.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
TR | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
ES | 20.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
FI | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
IT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
RO | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
SK | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
DK | 09.11.2011 | ||
EE | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
BG | 09.02.2012 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
CY | 09.11.2011 | ||
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
PL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 09.11.2011 | |
LT | 09.11.2011 | ||
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
LV | 09.11.2011 | ||
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
SE | 09.11.2011 | ||
SI | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
NL | 09.11.2011 | ||
GR | 10.02.2012 | ||
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
PT | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 09.11.2011 | |
IS | 09.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 09.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4903166 (GALVAGNI JOHN [US]) [X] 1,6,10-12 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 5 * * column 5, lines 51-56 * * figures 2-4 *; | [X]EP0479328 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,6-12 * column 6, line 37 - column 7, line 15 * * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 4 * * figure 8 *; | [A]WO2004077583 (EPCOS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,12* page 3, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 * |