EP1983635 - Spray cooled V-wedge for aerospace generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waddell, Simon L. 11710 N. Diamond Cholla Place Tucson, AZ 85737 / US | 02 /
Scherzinger, William M. 154 W. Red Pepper Place Tucson, AZ 85737 / US | 03 /
McDowall, Gregor 16423 S. 4th Street Phoenix, AZ 85048 / US | 04 /
Birdi, Balwinder S. 7534 E. Placita De La Poesia Tucson, AZ 85750 / US | 05 /
Duddeck, Michael W. 3572 E. Windy Point Dr. Tucson, AZ 85718 / US | 06 /
Down, Edward M. 2934 E. Devon Street Tucson, AZ 85716 / US | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08103555.2 | 15.04.2008 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | US20070735795 | 16.04.2007 Original published format: US 735795 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1983635 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1983635 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/24, // H02K3/52 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
H02K1/325 (EP,US);
H02K3/527 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | H02K3/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/27] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sprühgekühlter V-Keil für Luftfahrtsgenerator | [2008/43] | English: | Spray cooled V-wedge for aerospace generator | [2008/43] | French: | Coin en V refroidi par pulvérisation pour générateur aérospatial | [2008/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 15.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/14] | 28.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003030333 (JOHNSEN TYRONE A [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]WO2005096471 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-9 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]WO2004025810 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US2005023924 (TORNQUIST GERALD E [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 3-6 * |