EP2110533 - A pilot electronic control unit and a method to derive optimized look up tables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumacher, Herbert Muehlstr. 36 70839, Gerlingen / DE | 02 /
Kessler, Michael Buchenstr. 17 71287 Weissach / DE | 03 /
Kern, Christoph Wilhelmstr. 5 71546 Aspach / DE | 04 /
Kessler, michael Buchenstrasse 17 71287 Weissach / DE | 05 /
* * * | [2009/43] | Application number, filing date | 08103586.7 | 17.04.2008 | [2009/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2110533 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2110533 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D35/02, F02D41/24, F02D41/40 | [2009/43] | CPC: |
F02D41/2432 (EP);
F02D35/023 (EP);
F02D41/2422 (EP);
F02D41/28 (EP);
F02D41/403 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/25] |
Former [2009/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Pilotsteuereinheit und Verfahren zum Ableiten optimierter Verweistabellen | [2009/43] | English: | A pilot electronic control unit and a method to derive optimized look up tables | [2009/43] | French: | Unité de commande électronique de pilote et procédé pour dériver des tables de recherche optimisées | [2009/43] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 16.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1905989 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0024]; figure 5; claim 1 *; | [X]DE102006004738 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0026] , [0029] , [0032] *; | [A]FR2886729 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 12 * * page 3, line 1 - line 21 *; | [A]WO02095191 (RICARDO CONSULTING ENG [GB], et al) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]EP1164271 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] * paragraphs [0014] , [0019] *; | [A]EP1496237 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR], et al) [A] * paragraphs [0015] , [0029] , [0030] *; | [A]US6978666 (WU ZHIJIAN JAMES [US], et al) [A] * column 6, line 29 - line 45 *; | [A]EP1746278 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * paragraphs [0009] , [0019] , [0033]; claim 3 * | by applicant | US6964257 | EP1905989 |