EP1993032 - Electronic devices with touch-sensitive navigational mechanisms, and associated methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan District Taoyuan City 330 / TW | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW | ||
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states High Tech Computer Corp. (HTC) No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Chih-Feng No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | 02 /
Kao, Yih-Feng No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | 03 /
Wang, John C. No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | 04 /
Huang, Ming-San No. 23, Hsin Hua Rd. Taoyuan / TW | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2008/47] | Blasberg, Tilo 2K Patentanwälte Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08103901.8 | 09.05.2008 | [2008/47] | Priority number, date | TW20070117204 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: TW 96117204 | TW20070117205 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: TW 96117205 | TW20070117206 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: TW 96117206 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1993032 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1993032 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/44] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronische Geräte mit berührungsempfindlichen Navigationsmechanismen und entsprechende Verfahren | [2008/47] | English: | Electronic devices with touch-sensitive navigational mechanisms, and associated methods | [2008/47] | French: | Dispositifs électroniques avec des mécanismes de navigation tactiles, et procédés associés | [2008/47] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 28.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/41] | 11.07.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.08.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/41] | Appeal following examination | 28.07.2011 | Appeal received No. T2489/11 | 21.11.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.08.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 02.08.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP11161612.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 10.05.2011 | EP11183408.1 / EP2410418 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5594471 (DEERAN RICHARD J [US], et al) [Y] 4,11 * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 13; figures 4,5 *; | [A]WO9928811 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 1; figures 8,11A,11B; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]US2001045949 (CHITHAMBARAM NEMMARA [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,12-14 * page 8, paragraph 103; figures 4,5,8; claim 1 * * page 7, paragraph 84 *; | [A]US2003098871 (KAWANO SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* page 3, paragraph 37 - page 4, paragraph 46; figure 4; claims 1,2 *; | [XY]EP1657628 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,8-10,15 * column 3, paragraph 11; figure 8; claim 1 * [Y] 4-7,11-14 | Examination | US5327161 | EP1548552 | US2005168441 | by applicant | US5327161 | US5594471 | US2001045949 | EP1657628 |