EP1950757 - Limited play optical devices with interstitial reactive layer and methods of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexplay Technologies, Inc. 274 Madison Avenue, Suite 1500 New York, NY 10016 / US | [2008/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takiff, Larry 39 Amsden Street Arlington, MA MA 02476 / US | 02 /
Paulus, Joe 431 Brighton Avenue 2 Portland, ME ME 04102 / US | 03 /
Leblanc, Arthur 10 Alewive Farms Road Kennebunk, ME ME 04043 / US | 04 /
Thompson, Robert 1 Landing Drive Kennebunk, ME ME 04343 / US | 05 /
Exter, Neil 5 Todd Road Lexington, MA MA 02420 / US | 06 /
Bakos, Yannis 110 Bleeker Street Suite 30C New York, NY NY 10012 / US | 07 /
Minns, Richard 64 Clairemont Avenue Arlington, MA MA 02476 / US | [2008/31] | Representative(s) | Benson, Christopher HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Benson, Christopher Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08103910.9 | 05.06.2002 | [2008/31] | Priority number, date | US20010295903P | 05.06.2001 Original published format: US 295903 P | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1950757 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
G06F21/80 (EP);
G11B20/00086 (EP);
G11B20/00586 (EP);
G11B20/00608 (EP);
G11B20/00927 (EP);
G11B23/282 (EP);
G11B7/244 (EP);
G11B7/253 (EP);
G11B7/257 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/31] | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung mit begrenztem Spiel und interstitieller reaktiver Schicht sowie Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2008/31] | English: | Limited play optical devices with interstitial reactive layer and methods of making same | [2008/31] | French: | Dispositifs optiques à lecture limitée avec couche réactive interstitielle et procédés de fabrication | [2008/31] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02734703.8 / EP1395984 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0056529 (FLEXPLAY TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4891800 (SUGAYA SYOJI [JP]) [A] 5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9841979 (HIDE AND SEEK TECHNOLOGIES L L [US]) [X] 2-5 * page 16, line 24 - page 17, line 7 * * page 19, line 13 - page 20, line 7 * * figures 6,7 *; | [X]US5815484 (SMITH JERRY R [US], et al) [X] 2-5 * column 4, lines 5-23 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 35 * * figures 6,7 * | by applicant | US5815484 | US6011772 | US4404257 | US3697395 | US3697402 |