EP2020353 - Method and device for regulating the speed of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kettenacker, Guenter Tuerlesaeckerweg 10 71711, Steinheim / DE | [2009/06] | Application number, filing date | 08104356.4 | 11.06.2008 | [2009/06] | Priority number, date | DE20071035720 | 30.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007035720 | [2009/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2020353 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2020353 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/14, B60W10/06, B60W10/18 | [2009/06] | CPC: |
B60W30/143 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/196 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, SE [2009/41] |
Former [2009/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Geschwindigkeit eines Fahrzeugs | [2009/06] | English: | Method and device for regulating the speed of a vehicle | [2009/06] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de régulation de la vitesse d'un véhicule | [2009/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 05.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 09.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.01.2010 | SE | 27.01.2010 | [2011/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0715687 (DETROIT DIESEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-4,12 * paragraphs [0054] , [0057] , [0058]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0145374 (AE PLC [GB]) [A] 1-4,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0656276 (VOITH TURBO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4,12 * column 3, line 31 - line 52 *; | [A]EP0992388 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,12 * paragraphs [0022] , [0035] , [0026] *; | [A]DE2819175 (WABCO FAHRZEUGBREMSEN GMBH); | [A]DE4420116 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) | by applicant | DE10221341 |