EP2025843 - Window or door and component set of a locking part for a window or a door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEGENIA-AUBI KG Industriestrasse 1-3 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2011/48] |
Former [2009/08] | 01 /
* * * | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/48] | Application number, filing date | 08104496.8 | 20.06.2008 | [2009/08] | Priority number, date | DE20072011394U | 14.08.2007 Original published format: DE 202007011394 U | [2009/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2025843 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2025843 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2025843 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/18, E05F7/06 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
E05C9/1808 (EP);
E05D15/526 (EP);
E05F7/06 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/08] | E05C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Title | German: | Fenster der Tür und Bauteilsatz eines Riegelteils für ein Fenster oder eine Tür | [2009/08] | English: | Window or door and component set of a locking part for a window or a door | [2009/08] | French: | Fenêtre ou porte et composition d'un verrou pour une fenêtre ou une porte | [2009/08] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 05.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.11.2011 | CZ | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | EE | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | GR | 30.11.2011 | HR | 30.11.2011 | IE | 30.11.2011 | LT | 30.11.2011 | LV | 30.11.2011 | MT | 30.11.2011 | NL | 30.11.2011 | RO | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | SI | 30.11.2011 | SK | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | BG | 29.02.2012 | NO | 29.02.2012 | ES | 11.03.2012 | IS | 30.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | GB | 20.06.2012 | LU | 20.06.2012 | BE | 30.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 20.06.2012 | ||
LU | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
MT | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
GB | 20.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
RO | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
SK | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
EE | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
IE | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 29.02.2012 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
CZ | 30.11.2011 | ||
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 30.11.2011 | |
HR | 30.11.2011 | ||
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 30.11.2011 | |
LT | 30.11.2011 | ||
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
LV | 30.11.2011 | ||
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
SI | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NL | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 30.11.2011 | |
NO | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1813011U (HARTMANN & CO W [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1978136U (EUGEN NOTTER O H G [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [AD]DE29511379U (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [AD] 1,7 * abstract *; | [AD]DE10009288 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * column 3, line 54 - column 7, line 10; figures 1-7 *; | [AD]EP1208281 (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * column 3, paragraph 13 - column 5, paragraph 22; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE336544 | FR1012426 | DE1978136U | DE1813011 | AT286820B | DE29511379U | DE10009288 | EP0628691 | EP1208281 |