EP2019365 - System and method for entering a PIN securely [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Cherry GmbH Cherrystrasse 91275 Auerbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dressel, Horst Viehhofen 10 91235, Velden / DE | 02 /
Zapf, Thomas Hufeisenstr. 13 91257, Pegnitz / DE | 03 /
Dorn, Manfred Bussardweg 1 90480, Nürnberg / DE | 04 /
Pickelmann, Hans Lockenricht 16 92259, Neukirchen / DE | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/05] | Molnia, David df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08104808.4 | 21.07.2008 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | DE20071034346 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: DE102007034346 | [2009/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019365 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019365 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/20, G06F21/00 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F21/83 (EP,US);
G06F21/84 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/05] | G06F21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur sicheren Eingabe einer PIN | [2009/05] | English: | System and method for entering a PIN securely | [2009/05] | French: | Système et procédé de saisie sécurisée d'un code PIN | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 02.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2013 | 10.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/05] | 10.09.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.09.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0201520 (COVADIS S A [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1632838 (O2MICRO INT LTD [KY]) [X] 1-15* the whole document * | Examination | DE10359680 | by applicant | WO0201520 | EP1632838 |