EP2055483 - Display device for machines for processing printing substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/19] | Display device for machines that process printed materials | ||
[2012/45] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | New entry: Number of petition for review | 25.02.2022 | New entry: Petitioner in petition for review | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Intellectual Property AG & Co. KG Gutenbergring 19 69168 Wiesloch / DE | [2021/31] |
Former [2019/03] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berg, Winfried Panoramastraße 137a 69126, Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Franke, Volkhard Dossenheimer Weg 4 69198, Schriesheim / DE | 03 /
Hauck, Dieter Karlstalweg 12 69412, Eberbach / DE | 04 /
Maier, Till Wörthstraße 5 69115, Heidelberg / DE | [2013/13] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
Berg, Winfried Panoramastraße 137a 69126, Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
Franke, Volkhard Dossenheimer Weg 4 69198, Schriesheim / DE | |||
03 /
Hauck, Dieter Karlstalweg 12 69412, Eberbach / DE | |||
04 /
Maier, Till Wörthstraße 5 69115, Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08105512.1 | 08.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | DE20071052381 | 31.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007052381 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055483 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055483 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/02 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B41F33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung für Bedruckstoffe verarbeitende Maschinen | [2009/19] | English: | Display device for machines for processing printing substrates | [2012/46] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage pour machines de traitement de supports d'impression | [2012/46] |
Former [2009/19] | Display device for machines that process printed materials | ||
Former [2009/19] | Dispositif d'affichage pour machines de traitement de matières d'impression | Examination procedure | 06.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | 02
20.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Koenig & Bauer AG, et al, et al - Lizenzen - Patente - Friedrich-Koenig-Straße 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | 03
23.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130 / JP Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Maria-Theresia-Str. 13 81675 München / DE | [2020/02] |
Former [2019/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
20.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Olaf, et al, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-List-Straße 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
23.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130 / JP Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Maria-Theresia-Str. 13 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE Opponent's representative Stahl, Dietmar, et al, et al manroland sheetfed GmbH Intellectual Property (SRI) Mühlheimerstrasse 341 63075 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
02
20.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Olaf, et al, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-List-Straße 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
23.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130 / JP Opponent's representative Uexküll & Stolberg, et al, et al Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Maria-Theresia-Str. 13 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2016/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE Opponent's representative Stahl, Dietmar, et al, et al manroland sheetfed GmbH Intellectual Property (SRI) Mühlheimerstrasse 341 63075 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
02
20.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Koenig & Bauer AG BKS - Schutzrechte/Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Olaf, et al, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-List-Straße 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
23.12.2013
03.02.2014
ADMISSIBLE Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130 / JP Opponent's representative Manke, Lars, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Maria-Theresia-Strasse 13 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE Opponent's representative Stahl, Dietmar, et al, et al Manroland sheetfed Manufacturing GmbH Mühlheimer Straße 341 DE-63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
20.12.2013
Koenig & Bauer AG Bogenoffset BKS - Schutzrechte und Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Olaf, et al, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-List-Straße 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | |||
03
23.12.2013
Komori Corporation 11-1, Azumabashi 3-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130 / JP Opponent's representative Manke, Lars, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Maria-Theresia-Strasse 13 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
manroland sheetfed GmbH Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE Opponent's representative Stahl, Dietmar, et al, et al Manroland sheetfed Manufacturing GmbH Mühlheimer Straße 341 DE-63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
02
20.12.2013
Koenig & Bauer AG Bogenoffset BKS - Schutzrechte und Lizenzen Friedrich-List-Str. 47 01445 Radebeul / DE Opponent's representative Schinkel, Olaf, et al, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-List-Straße 47 01445 Radebeul / DE | 10.02.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.05.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.09.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/07] | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 20.07.2016 | Appeal received No. T1786/16 | 18.10.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.09.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 28.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Petition(s) for review: | 26.01.2022 | Petition for review received | Number: R0004/22 | for appeal No. T1786/16-3205 | Petitioner: APPR | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2008 | CY | 27.03.2013 | CZ | 27.03.2013 | DK | 27.03.2013 | EE | 27.03.2013 | FI | 27.03.2013 | HR | 27.03.2013 | IT | 27.03.2013 | LT | 27.03.2013 | LV | 27.03.2013 | MC | 27.03.2013 | MT | 27.03.2013 | NL | 27.03.2013 | PL | 27.03.2013 | RO | 27.03.2013 | SE | 27.03.2013 | SI | 27.03.2013 | SK | 27.03.2013 | TR | 27.03.2013 | BG | 27.06.2013 | NO | 27.06.2013 | GR | 28.06.2013 | ES | 08.07.2013 | IS | 27.07.2013 | PT | 29.07.2013 | AT | 08.10.2013 | IE | 08.10.2013 | LU | 08.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 08.10.2008 | |
CY | 27.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
AT | 08.10.2013 | ||
IE | 08.10.2013 | ||
LU | 08.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
TR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
AT | 08.10.2013 | ||
IE | 08.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
AT | 08.10.2013 | ||
IE | 08.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
IE | 08.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
DK | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 27.03.2013 | |
CZ | 27.03.2013 | ||
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
PL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 27.03.2013 | |
EE | 27.03.2013 | ||
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
RO | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
SK | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 27.03.2013 | |
FI | 27.03.2013 | ||
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
NL | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
ES | 08.07.2013 | ||
IS | 27.07.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
PT | 29.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
HR | 27.03.2013 | ||
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
LV | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 27.03.2013 | |
LT | 27.03.2013 | ||
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
SI | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
GR | 28.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
SE | 27.03.2013 | ||
BG | 27.06.2013 | ||
NO | 27.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 27.03.2013 | |
NO | 27.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4239052 (KBA PLANETA AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,15 * column 1, line 38 - line 58 * * column 2, line 2 - line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2288367 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,9,15 * page 1, line 5 - line 24 * * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 21 * * page 5, line 2 - line 18; figure 1 *; | [X]US5163012 (WUHRL ARNO [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,8,9,12,15 * column 2, line 40 - line 53 * * column 3, line 36 - line 44 * * column 5, line 11 - line 32 * * column 4, line 13 - line 50 * * column 10, line 10 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0884182 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * column 3, line 23 - line 37 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 32 * * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 43 - line 58 * * column 8, line 12 - line 21 *; | [AD]DE102005001417 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [AD] 1,15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0045] * | by applicant | DE102005001417 | DE4239052 | GB2288367 | US5163012 |