EP2015214 - Systems and methods for secure transaction management and electronic rights protection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intertrust Technologies Corp 955 Stewart Drive Sunnyvale CA 94085-3913 / US | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ginter, Karl, L. 10404 43rd Avenue Beltsville MD 20705 / US | 02 /
Shear, Victor, H. 5203 Battery Lane Bethesda MD 20814 / US | 03 /
Spahn, Francis, J. 2410 Edwards Avenue El Cerrito CA 94530 / US | 04 /
Van Wie, David, M. P.O. Box 5610 Eugene OR 97405 / US | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Williams, Michael Ian Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Williams, Michael Ian fj Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08105555.0 | 13.02.1996 | [2009/03] | Priority number, date | US19950388107 | 13.02.1995 Original published format: US 388107 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2015214 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2015214 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | [2009/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F21/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
G06Q50/184 (EP,US);
G06F21/109 (EP,US);
G06F21/16 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
G06F21/6209 (EP,US);
G06F21/71 (EP,US);
G06F21/86 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q20/02 (EP,US);
G06Q20/023 (EP,US);
G06Q20/04 (EP,US);
G06Q20/085 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/123 (EP,US);
G06Q20/1235 (EP,US);
G06Q20/14 (EP,US);
G06Q20/24 (EP,US);
G06Q20/306 (EP);
G06Q20/308 (EP);
G06Q30/0273 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0283 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0609 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/12 (EP,US);
G06Q50/188 (EP,US);
G06T1/0021 (EP,US);
G07F9/026 (EP,US);
H04L63/02 (EP,US);
H04L63/04 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0435 (EP,US);
H04L63/0442 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L63/16 (EP,US);
H04L63/168 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP,US);
H04L9/006 (EP,US);
H04L9/0819 (EP,US);
H04L9/0838 (EP,US);
H04L9/0861 (EP,US);
H04L9/3218 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L9/3263 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/23476 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/2362 (EP,US);
H04N21/2541 (EP,US);
H04N21/2543 (EP,US);
H04N21/2547 (EP,US);
H04N21/25875 (EP,US);
H04N21/4143 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4345 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/44204 (EP,US);
H04N21/443 (EP,US);
H04N21/4627 (EP,US);
H04N21/4753 (EP,US);
H04N21/6581 (EP,US);
H04N21/8166 (EP,US);
H04N21/835 (EP,US);
H04N21/8355 (EP,US);
H04N21/83555 (EP,US);
H04N21/8358 (EP,US);
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N7/162 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US);
H04N7/17309 (EP,US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2101 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2135 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2137 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2151 (EP,US);
G06Q2220/16 (EP,US);
H04L2209/56 (EP,US);
H04L2209/60 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
H04L2463/102 (EP,US);
H04L2463/103 (EP,US);
H04N2005/91364 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/03] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2009/03] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Verwaltung sicherer Transaktionen und zum Schutz der elektronischen Rechte | [2009/03] | English: | Systems and methods for secure transaction management and electronic rights protection | [2009/03] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de gestion de transactions sécurisées et de protection des droits électroniques | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96922371.8 / EP0861461 | Divisional application(s) | EP09156840.2 / EP2110732 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960922371) is 17.09.1999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9220022 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-15 * page 6; figures 1,2 * * page 12 *; | [X] - MORI R ET AL, "SUPERDISTRIBUTION: THE CONCEPT AND THE ARCHITECTURE", TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, INST. OF ELECTRONICS & COMMUNIC. ENGINEERS OF JAPAN. TOKYO, JP, (199007), vol. E73, no. 7, pages 1133 - 1146, XP000159229 [X] 1-15 * page 1135; figure 5 * * page 1139 * | [Y] - BRUCE SCHNEIER, Applied Cryptography, (1994), ISBN 0-471-59756-2, XP002548393 [Y] 1-15 * page 150 - page 151 * |