EP2062698 - Hand tool machine with striking tool holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/22] | Hand tool machine with striking tool holder and associated tool | ||
[2013/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cycon, Alexander / Landhausstrasse 1 75228, Ispringen / DE | [2013/23] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Cycon, Alexander Landhausstrasse 1 75228, Ispringen / DE | Representative(s) | Söllner, Oliver Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2013/23] |
Former [2009/22] | Söllner, Oliver Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 08105656.6 | 24.10.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | DE20071056531 | 23.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007056531 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062698 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062698 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25D17/06, B25D17/08, // B25D17/02 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
B25D17/06 (EP,US);
B25D17/02 (EP,US);
B25D17/088 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0034 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0042 (EP,US);
B25D2250/365 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | B25D17/06, B25D17/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | Handwerkzeugmaschine mit Schlagwerkzeugaufnahme | [2013/02] | English: | Hand tool machine with striking tool holder | [2013/02] | French: | Machine-outil manuelle dotée d'une réception d'outil de percussion | [2013/02] |
Former [2009/22] | Handwerkzeugmaschine mit Schlagwerkzeugaufnahme und zugeordnetes Werkzeug | ||
Former [2009/22] | Hand tool machine with striking tool holder and associated tool | ||
Former [2009/22] | Machine-outil manuelle dotée d'une réception d'outil de percussion et outil correspondant | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 06.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2008 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | HR | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | NL | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | NO | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | AT | 24.10.2013 | IE | 24.10.2013 | LU | 24.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 24.10.2008 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
LU | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
AT | 24.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 24.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
NL | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CZ | 05.06.2013 | |
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
HR | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
NO | 05.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH556719 (STUDER RUDOLF) [Y] 12 * column 2, lines 5-41 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]CH642580 (DUSS FRIEDRICH MASCHF [DE]) [Y] 6 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0171358 (HILTI AG [LI]) [X] 14,15 * claims 1,6-10 * * figure 3 *; | [XY]DE10157831 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-11 * paragraphs [0017] - [0023] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6,12; | [A]EP1602452 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 14,15* figures 2a,2b *; | [PA]DE102006046472 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 4 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US4184692 | EP0160463 | DE3720512 |