EP2090591 - Antibodies, recombinant antibodies, recombinant antibody fragments and fusions mediated plant disease resistance against fungi [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peschen, Dieter Pfarrer-Holzberg-Str. 18 52511 Geilenkirchen-Tripsrath / DE | 02 /
Liao, Yu-Cai College of Plant Science and Technology Huazhong Agricultural University Wuhan, Hubei 430070 / CN | 03 /
Fischer, Rainer Menzerath 1 52156 Monschau / DE | 04 /
Dorfmüller, Simone 23 West Coast Crescent Tower B no. 06-11 128046 Singapore / SG | 05 /
Schillberg, Stefan Bremenberg 24 52072 Aachen / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 08105837.2 | 14.04.2003 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | EP20020008929 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: EP 02008929 | EP20020011807 | 28.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02011807 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090591 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2090591 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00, C07K16/14, C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C12N15/82, C12N5/10, C07K14/79, C12N9/24 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
C12N15/8282 (EP,US);
C07K16/14 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
C12N15/8258 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/13 (EP,US);
C07K2317/23 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C07K2319/41 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | Antikörper, rekombinante Antikörper, rekombinante Antikörperfragmente und fusionsvermittelte Pflanzenkrankheitsresistenz gegenüber Pilzen | [2009/34] | English: | Antibodies, recombinant antibodies, recombinant antibody fragments and fusions mediated plant disease resistance against fungi | [2009/34] | French: | Anticorps, anticorps recombinants, fragments anticorps recombinants et fusions liées à la maladie des plantes résistantes contre les champignons | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 14.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 09.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03720467.4 / EP1497333 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030720467) is 04.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6087560 (CORNELISSEN BERNARDUS J C [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0023593 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9609398 (RIJKSLANDBOUWHOGESCHOOL [NL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9600783 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al); | [Y] - LIAO YU CAI ET AL, "Characterization of a wheat class Ib chitinase gene differentially induced in isogenic lines by infection with Puccinia graminis.", PLANT SCIENCE (LIMERICK), vol. 103, no. 2, ISSN 0168-9452, (1994), Database accession no. Q41539, pages 177 - 187, URL: EMBL, XP009017155 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9452(94)90206-2 | [ ] - EMBL, (19931113), Database accession no. X76041, URL: EMBL, XP002253953 [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - EMBL, (19961101), Database accession no. Q41539, URL: EMBL, XP002253954 [ ] * abstract * | [PY] - PESCHEN D, "SYNTHETIC CONSTRUCT FOR ANTI-FUSARIUM SCFV ANTIBODY, CLONE CWP2", EMBL, (20021129), XP002253955 [PY] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - GROVER ANITA ET AL, "Removal of vacuolar targeting signal from class I vacuolar chitinase leads to its extracellular secretion in transgenic tobacco", JOURNAL OF PLANT BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200107), vol. 10, no. 2, ISSN 0971-7811, pages 139 - 142, XP009024181 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - GAN ZHIBO ET AL, "The characterization of chicken antibodies raised against Fusarium spp. by enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay and immunoblotting", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1997), vol. 38, no. 2-3, ISSN 0168-1605, pages 191 - 200, XP002254389 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1605(97)00108-6 | [A] - SCHOUTEN A ET AL, "THE C-TERMINAL KDEL SEQUENCE INCREASES THE EXPRESSION LEVEL OF A SINGLE-CHAIN ANTIBODY DESIGNED TO BE TARGETED TO BOTH THE CYTOSOL AND THE SECRETORY PATHWAY IN TRANSGENIC TOBACCO", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, NIJHOFF PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NL, (1996), vol. 30, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 781 - 793, XP000677225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00019011 | [A] - TAVLADORAKI P ET AL, "TRANSGENIC PLANTS EXPRESSING A FUNCTIONAL SINGLE-CHAIN FV ANTIBODY SPECIFICALLY P ROTECTED FROM VIRUS ATTACK", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19931202), vol. 366, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 469 - 472, XP000421325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/366469a0 | [T] - PESCHEN DIETER ET AL, "Fusion proteins comprising a Fusarium-specific antibody linked to antifungal peptides protect plants against a fungal pathogen", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200406), vol. 22, no. 6, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 732 - 738, XP002543801 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt970 | by applicant | - BENHAMOU, N., "Immunocytochemistry of plant defense mechanisms induced upon microbial attack", MICROSC. RES. TECH., (1995), vol. 31, pages 63 - 78 | - DESJANDINS A.E.; T.M. HOHN., "Mycotoxins in Plant Pathogenesis", MOLECULAR PLANT-MICROBE INTERACTIONS., (1997), vol. 10, pages 147 - 152 | - K6HLER, G.; C. MILSTEIN, "Continuous cultures of fused cells secreting antibody of predefined specificity", NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, doi:doi:10.1038/256495a0, pages 495 - 497, XP000650513 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/256495a0 | - LE GALL, F.; BOVE, J.M.; GARNIER, M., "Engineering of a single-chain variable-fragment (scFv) antibody specific for the stolbur phytoplasma (Mollicute) and its expression in Escherichia coli and tobacco plants", APPL ENVIRON MICRO., (1998), vol. 64, pages 4566 - 4572 | - MOURGUES, F.; BRISSET, M.N.; CHEVREAU, E., "Strategies to improve plant resistance to bacterial diseases through genetic engineering", TIBTECH, (1998), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/S0167-7799(98)01189-5, pages 203 - 210, XP004117784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(98)01189-5 | - SCHILLBERG, S. ET AL., "Plasma membrane display of anti-viral single chain Fv fragments confers resistance to tobacco mosaic virus", MOLECULAR BREEDING., (2000), vol. 6, pages 317 - 326 | - SCHILLBERG, S. ET AL., "Antibody-based resistance to plant pathogens", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 10, pages 1 - 12 | - TAVLADORAKI, P. ET AL., "Transgenic plants expressing a functional scFv antibody are protected from virus attack", NATURE, (1993), vol. 366, pages 469 - 472 | - TURNER, D.J.; M.A. RITTER; A.J. GEORGE., "Importance of the linker in expression of single-chain Fv antibody fragments: optimisation of peptide sequence using phage display technology", J IMMUNOL METHODS, (1997), vol. 205, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00057-4, pages 43 - 54, XP004102856 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(97)00057-4 | - VOSS, A. ET AL., "Reduced virus infectivity in N. tabacum secreting a TMV-specific full size antibody", MOL. BREEDING, (1995), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1007/BF01682088, pages 39 - 50, XP002923008 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01682088 | - VAQUERO, C. ET AL., "Transient expression of a tumor-specific single-chain fragment and a chimeric antibody in tobacco leaves", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (1999), vol. 96, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.96.20.11128, pages 11128 - 33, XP002454738 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.20.11128 | - VAUGHAN CK.; SOLLAZZO,M, "Of minibody, camel and bacteriophage", COMB CHEM HIGH THROUGHPUT SCREEN, (2001), vol. 4, pages 417 - 30, XP009110312 | - WATTAD, C. ET AL., "Pectate lyase of Colletotrichum gloeosporioides attacking avocado fruits - cDNA cloning and involvement in pathogenicity", PHYSIOLOGICAL & MOLECULAR PLANT PATHOLOGY, (1997), vol. 50, pages 197 - 212 | - YUAN, R. ET AL., "Antibody- mediated modulation of Cryptococcus neoformans infection is dependent on distinct Fc receptor functions and IgG subclasses", J EXP MED, (1998), vol. 187, pages 641 - 648 | - ZIMMERMANN, S. ET AL., "Intracellular expression of a TMV-specific single chain Fv fragment leads to improved virus resistance in Nicotiana tabacum", MOLECULAR BREEDING, (1998), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1009638600492, pages 369 - 379, XP002135713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1009638600492 | - ZASLOFF, M., "Antimicrobial peptides of multicellular organisms", NATURE, (2002), vol. 415, doi:doi:10.1038/415389a, pages 389 - 395, XP001027353 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/415389a |